EP3512943 - CRISP-SEQ, AN INTEGRATED METHOD FOR MASSIVELY PARALLEL SINGLE CELL RNA-SEQ AND CRISPR POOLED SCREENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMIT, Ido Meonot Wolfson 31C The Weizmann Institute of Science 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
JAITIN, Diego c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
LARA-ASTIASO, David c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
WEINER, Assaf c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 05 /
YOFE, Ido c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17777660.6 | 14.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017IL51043 | Priority number, date | US201662394324P | 14.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662394324 P | US201662421503P | 14.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421503 P | US201662427325P | 29.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662427325 P | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018051347 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512943 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3512943 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12N15/63 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
C40B40/02 (EP);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/1093 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
C40B40/06 (EP);
C07H21/02 (US);
C07H21/04 (US);
C12N15/85 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12N15/1093, C12Q2563/179 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CRISP-SEQ, INTEGRIERTES VERFAHREN FÜR MASSIV PARALLELE EINZELZELLEN-RNA-SEQ UND CRISPR-GEPOOLTE SCREENS | [2019/30] | English: | CRISP-SEQ, AN INTEGRATED METHOD FOR MASSIVELY PARALLEL SINGLE CELL RNA-SEQ AND CRISPR POOLED SCREENS | [2019/30] | French: | CRISP-SEQ, PROCÉDÉ INTÉGRÉ POUR SÉQUENÇAGE MASSIVEMENT PARALLÈLE D'ARN UNICELLULAIRE ET CRIBLAGES REGROUPÉS PAR CRISPR | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 03.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | IE | 14.09.2023 | LU | 14.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
IE | 14.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
IE | 14.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA2932478 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,15-17* figure 1 *; | [XP] - JAITIN DIEGO ADHEMAR ET AL, "Dissecting Immune Circuits by Linking CRISPR-Pooled Screens with Single-Cell RNA-Seq", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20161215), vol. 167, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2016.11.039, ISSN 0092-8674, page 1883, XP029850714 [XP] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2016.11.039 | [XI] - WONG ALAN S L ET AL, Multiplexed barcoded CRISPR-Cas9 screening enabled by CombiGEM, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VOL. 113, NR. 9, PAGE(S) 2544-2549, (201603), ISSN 0027-8424, XP002775745 [X] 1,5-8,10-14,18-20,22-24,27,29 * figures 1,2 * [I] 9,21,25,26,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1517883113 | [Y] - CASSANDRA L LOVE, JANE HEALY, ADRIENNE GREENOUGH, SANDEEP S. DAVE AND GUOJIE LI, "Silencing Mutations in NOTCH1 Activate Calcium Signaling in B Cells", BLOOD, 56TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 06 -09, 2014, (20141204), vol. 124, no. 21, ISSN 0006-4971, XP002775746 [Y] 2-4,15-17 * paragraph [0004] * | [Y] - GUHA SIDDARTH ET AL, "Tu1957: Functional Characterization of a Novel Oncogene GNAS in Pancreatic Cancer Cells", GASTROENTEROLOGY, 46TH ANNUAL DIGESTIVE DISEASE WEEK (DDW); WASHINGTON, DC, USA; MAY 16 -19, 2015, (201504), vol. 148, no. 4, Suppl. 1, doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(15)33224-8, ISSN 0016-5085, page S945, XP002775747 [Y] 2-4,15-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(15)33224-8 | by applicant | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US4879219 | US5011771 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US5281521 | US2015307874 | US2016298096 | - WONG et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20160301), vol. 113, no. 9, pages 2544 - 2549 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AAL33912 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AAF22695 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AAL33917 | - "Uniprot", Database accession no. D6NKF4 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AAK73766 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. NP_568674 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AAK09208 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. AF329457 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. NP_561589 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. NM_125776 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. S 11540 | - SOUTHERN P.; BERG, P., J. Molec. Appl. Genet., (19820000), vol. 1, page 327 | - MULLIGAN, R. C.; BERG, P., Science, (19800000), vol. 209, page 1422 | - SUGDEN, B. et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 410 - 413 | - PANYAM, Adv Drug Deliv Rev., (20120913), vol. S0169-40, no. 12, pages 00283 - 9 | - Generation of transgenic mice | - GAMA et al., Brain Struct Funct, (20100300), vol. 214, no. 2-3, pages 91 - 109 | - HUSAINI et al., GM Crops, (20110600), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 150 - 62 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (19940000), vol. I-III | - WATSON et al., Recombinant DNA, Scientific American Books | - Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19980000), vol. 1-4 | - Cell Biology: A Laboratory Handbook, (19940000), vol. I-III | - Current Protocols in Immunology, (19940000), vol. I-III | - Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, vol. 1-317 |