EP3519315 - SEALING CAP FOR A CONTAINER FOR HOLDING A MEDICAL LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDENBURGER, Torsten Haingrabenweg 5 61203 Reichelsheim / DE | 02 /
FRENSCH, Christian Königsteinerstraße 1 65719 Hofheim / DE | 03 /
PFEFFER, Andreas Mragowo Str. 9 35305 Grünberg / DE | 04 /
DEGEN, Alexander Querstr. 6 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17777874.3 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP74631 | Priority number, date | EP20160191179 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16191179 | [2019/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060333 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519315 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
B65D51/002 (EP,KR,US);
A61J1/1406 (US);
A61J1/1412 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSKAPPE FÜR EIN BEHÄLTNIS ZUM AUFNEHMEN EINER MEDIZINISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2019/32] | English: | SEALING CAP FOR A CONTAINER FOR HOLDING A MEDICAL LIQUID | [2019/32] | French: | CAPUCHON DE FERMETURE POUR UN CONTENANT DESTINÉ À CONTENIR UN LIQUIDE MÉDICAL | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 25.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2906423 (ROLAND SANDHAGE ELLSWORTH); | [A]US4872572 (SCHROOTEN RIK [BE]); | [Y]US6221056 (SILVERMAN DAVID G [US]); | [YD]EP1457429 (HELVOET PHARMA [BE]); | [A]JP2004290218 (AJINOMOTO FARUMA KK); | [YD]WO2006042579 (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2008042939 (SCHERER TECHNOLOGIES INC R P [US], et al); | [A]WO2015104888 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | EP1457429 | WO2006042579 | WO2010066373 |