EP3491376 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR DETECTING VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN GLASS PACKAGING PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated SP-TI-3-1 One Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKHALTER, Robert Scott 161 Deerland Ave. Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 02 /
FADEEV, Andrei Gennadyevich 214 Lancelot Drive Elmira, New York 14903 / US | 03 /
PEANASKY, John Stephen 2730 County Line Drive Big Flats, New York 14814 / US | 04 /
SAUER, David Charles 236 Stuart Street Horseheads, New York 14845 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2019/23] | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 17778006.1 | 01.09.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US49930 | Priority number, date | US201662382855P | 02.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662382855 P | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018045329 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491376 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3491376 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, A61L2/04, C03C17/28, G01N33/38 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/0047 (EP,US);
G01N33/0016 (US);
A61L2/04 (US);
G01N33/0004 (RU);
G01N33/386 (EP,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | G01N33/00, A61L2/04, C03C17/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON FLÜCHTIGEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN IN GLASVERPACKUNGSVERPACKUNGEN | [2019/23] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR DETECTING VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN GLASS PACKAGING PROCESSES | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE DÉTECTION DE COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES VOLATILS DANS DES PROCESSUS D'EMBALLAGE DE VERRE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2023 | 04.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20040089318 (HANYANG HAK WON CO LTD) [X] 17-22* figure 2 *; | [X]KR20070090508 (ECOPRO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 17-22 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2016251260 (BAYNE JOHN FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * figure 10 * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0171] * | Examination | US2016017170 | US9428302 | by applicant | US4595548 | US4680373 | US4880895 | US6232428 | US6277950 | US6444783 | WO2007016516 | US2008214777 | US7619042 | US8053492 | US2013327740 | US2014151370 | - "Differential interference contrast (DIC) microscopy and modulation contrast microscopy", Fundamentals of light microscopy and digital imaging, Wiley-Liss, pages 153 - 168 | - "Nondestructive Detection of Glass Vial Inner Surface Morphology with Differential Interference Contrast Microscopy", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20120000), vol. 101, no. 4, pages 1378 - 1384 |