EP3512452 - AUGMENTED REALITY SURGICAL TECHNIQUE GUIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Inc. 1800 W. Center Street Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, John R. 12 Stone Camp Trail Winona Lake, Indiana 46590 / US | 02 /
NASH, Seth Anderson 1525 White Coral Ct Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US | 03 /
GALLOWAY, Annelise 1690 Hawthorne Ct. Winona Lake, Indiana 46590 / US | 04 /
CLAYPOOL, Jody, L. PO Box 122 Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | 05 /
OWENS, J. Scott 1130 Downing St SW East Sparta, Ohio 44626 / US | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17778014.5 | 13.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017US51312 | Priority number, date | US201662395591P | 16.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662395591 P | US201762470690P | 13.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762470690 P | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018052966 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512452 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/10, A61B34/20, A61B34/00, A61B90/98, A61B90/94, A61B90/96 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A61B34/25 (EP,US);
G06T19/006 (US);
A61B50/20 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B90/94 (EP,US);
A61B90/96 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
G06T11/003 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/252 (EP,US);
A61B2034/254 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
A61B2050/311 (EP,US);
A61B2090/365 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B50/00 (US);
A63F2300/69 (US);
G02B2027/0138 (US);
G02B2027/014 (US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/014 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G09G2340/125 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | OPERATIONSTECHNIKANLEITUNG MIT ERWEITERTER REALITÄT | [2019/30] | English: | AUGMENTED REALITY SURGICAL TECHNIQUE GUIDANCE | [2019/30] | French: | GUIDAGE DE TECHNIQUE CHIRURGICALE À RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 15.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2020/41] | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2005084570 (ORTHOSOFT INC [CA]) [I] 1-3 * figure 7 * * page 28, line 4 * * page 2, line 25 *; | [A]US2008200926 (VERARD LAURENT [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0051] , [0065] - [0067] * * figures 4,6A,6B *; | [A]US2014275760 (LEE HEE KUK [KR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0075] , [0076] , [0097] * * figure 11 *; | [A]US2016191887 (CASAS CARLOS QUILES [ES]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0177]; figures 2,4,5 *; | [IA]WO2016133644 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0027] * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0045] * * paragraph [0011] * [A] 8,9 |