EP3440627 - IMAGE DEHAZING AND RESTORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carmel Haifa University Economic Corporation Ltd. Eshkol Tower, Haifa University Mount Carmel 31905 Haifa / IL | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296 6130201 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREIBITZ, Avital 43 HaZamir Street 7031139 Beer Yaacov / IL | 02 /
BERMAN, Dana 10 Yonatan Netanyahu Street 5620211 Yehud / IL | 03 /
AVIDAN, Shai 11 HaOfek Street 4356562 Ra'anana / IL | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17778801.5 | 06.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017IL50426 | Priority number, date | US201662319338P | 07.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662319338 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175231 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440627 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/20, G06T7/90 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G06T5/73 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/9027 (IL,US);
G06F18/22 (IL,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,IL,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,IL,US);
G06T2207/20061 (EP,IL,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | G06T5/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | BILDSCHARFSTELLUNG UND WIEDERHERSTELLUNG | [2019/07] | English: | IMAGE DEHAZING AND RESTORATION | [2019/07] | French: | DÉBRUMAGE ET RESTAURATION D'IMAGES | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA] - BERMAN DANA ET AL, "Non-local Image Dehazing", 2016 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), IEEE, (20160627), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2016.185, pages 1674 - 1682, XP033021345 [XP] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * page 1676, column l, line 14 - page 1679, column l, line 4 * [A] 5,10,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2016.185 | International search | [A]US6687414 (EDGAR ALBERT D [US]) [A] 1-66 * The whole document *; | [A]US2010067823 (KOPF JOHANNES P [DE], et al) [A] 1-66 * The whole document *; | [A]US2010259651 (FATTAL RAANAN [IL]) [A] 1-66 * The whole document *; | [A]CN104504658 (SHENZHEN INST OF ADV TECH CAS) [A] 1-66 * The whole document *; | [A]WO2015125146 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL]) [A] 1-66 * The whole document *; | [A]WO2015192115 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-66 * The whole document *; | [A] - "Hierarchical rank-based veiling light estimation for underwater dehazing", Proceedings of the British Machine Vision Conference (BMVC, (20150930), pages 125.1 - 125.12, XP055428050 [A] 1-66 * The whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5244/C.29.125 |