EP3441238 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Tochigi Co., Ltd. 18-4, Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Tochigi Co., Ltd. 18-4, Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sumitomo (SEI) Steel Wire Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | |||
For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Akifumi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOCHIGI CO., LTD. 18-4 Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Kazuhiko c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOCHIGI CO., LTD. 18-4 Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMURA, Shinei c/o Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Masumi c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 05 /
FUJISAWA, Koji c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/34] | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Akifumi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOCHIGI CO. LTD. 18-4 Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Kazuhiko c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOCHIGI CO. LTD. 18-4 Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAMURA, Shinei c/o Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Masumi c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
FUJISAWA, Koji c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | |||
Former [2019/07] | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Akifumi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOCHIGI CO. LTD. 18-4 Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Kazuhiko c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOCHIGI CO. LTD. 18-4 Kiyohara-Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAMURA, Shinei c/o SUMITOMO (SEI) STEEL WIRE CORP. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Masumi c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
FUJISAWA, Koji c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/07] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17778854.4 | 09.02.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017JP04674 | Priority number, date | JP20160076076 | 05.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016076076 | [2019/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175475 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441238 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3441238 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/20, B60C9/00, D07B1/06 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B60C9/0057 (EP,US);
B60C9/2006 (EP,KR,US);
B60C9/00 (EP,US);
B60C9/0007 (EP,US);
B60C9/20 (EP,US);
D07B1/06 (EP,KR);
D07B1/0606 (US);
B60C2009/0021 (EP,US);
B60C2009/0085 (EP,US);
B60C2009/0092 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2048 (US);
B60C2009/2064 (EP,KR,US);
B60C2009/2067 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2077 (EP,US);
B60C2009/209 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2019/07] | English: | TIRE | [2019/07] | French: | PNEU | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2018 | Translation filed | 02.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 22.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2017 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | GB | 09.02.2021 | IE | 09.02.2021 | LU | 09.02.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 09.02.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
GB | 09.02.2021 | ||
IE | 09.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 09.02.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
GB | 09.02.2021 | ||
IE | 09.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.02.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
GB | 09.02.2021 | ||
IE | 09.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
GB | 09.02.2021 | ||
IE | 09.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
GB | 09.02.2021 | ||
IE | 09.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 09.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 09.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]WO2016124422 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [XP] 1-7 * abstract * * page 11, line 39 - page 12, line 8 * * page 12, line 19 - line 22 * * page 13, line 12 - line 24 * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 6 * * page 16, line 23 - line 25 * * page 16, line 31 * * page 18, line 1 - line 11 *[A] 8,9 | International search | [A]JPS5222202 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 4047552 A *; | [A]JPH0374206 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text & EP 413582 A2 & DE 69016130 C & ES 2069697 T *; | [A]JPH0399904 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH05140881 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0022]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 5472033 A column 2, line 44 to column 4, the last line; table 1; fig. 1 to 3 & EP 543640 A1 & DE 69207866 C *; | [Y]JPH06166970 (TOKYO ROPE MFG CO) [Y] 6-9 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0009], [0011], [0013]; paragraph [0014], table 2; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0747806 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0008], [0012] to [0014]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH10259582 (KANAI HIROAKI) [Y] 6-9 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0017]; paragraph [0018], table 1; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JPH10297213 (BRIDGESTONE METALPHA CORP) [X] 1-3, 5 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0026]; fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 6-9; | [XY]JPH11192810 (BRIDGESTONE METALPHA CORP) [X] 1-3, 5 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0008], [0018], [0030] to [0041]; fig. 1, 8, 9 (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 6-9; | [Y]JPH11241282 (TOKYO SEIKO CO LTD) [Y] 6-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0003], [0013], [0037] to [0041]; paragraph [0055], table 2; fig. 5, 10, 11, 24 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001328406 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004216977 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0010], [0025]; paragraph [0038], table 2 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2013199193 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3 * , paragraph [0026]; paragraph [0032], table 2; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014203908 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* , entire text; all drawings & US 2016/0144662 A1 & JP 2015-3666 A & CN 105263725 A & AU 2014282221 A * |