EP3441496 - AUSTENITE STAINLESS STEEL AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/25] |
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETO, Masahiro c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
SAGARA, Masayuki c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Kenta c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
OSUKI, Takahiro c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17779217.3 | 06.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017JP14414 | Priority number, date | JP20160076401 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016076401 | [2019/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175839 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441496 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3441496 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, B23K35/30, C21D6/00, C21D8/00, C21D8/02, C21D8/06, C21D8/10, C21D9/08, C22C38/60, C21D9/00, C21D9/46, C21D9/52, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/44, C22C38/48, C22C38/58, C21D7/02, C21D7/13, B23K103/06 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/3086 (EP,US);
C21D6/004 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D7/02 (EP,US);
C21D7/13 (EP,US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0247 (EP,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP,US);
C21D8/065 (EP,US);
C21D8/105 (EP,US);
C21D9/0068 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C21D9/525 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2103/05 (US);
B23K2103/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSTENITISCHER EDELSTAHL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/07] | English: | AUSTENITE STAINLESS STEEL AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/07] | French: | ACIER INOXYDABLE AUSTÉNITIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE FABRIQUER | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | Translation filed | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 08.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 06.04.2017 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 06.04.2017 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11256283 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-14 * example 13; claim 1; tables 1,2 *; | [A]US2006243356 (OIKAWA YUUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0081]; claims 11,16; tables 11,16,17 ** abstract * | International search | [A]WO2009044802 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * , & US 2010/0054983 A1 & US 2012/0141318 A1 & US 2015/0010425 A1 & EP 2199420 A1 & CA 2698562 A1 & KR 10-2010-0060026 A & CN 102317489 A & KR 10-2012-0137520 A & DK 2199420 T3 & ES 2420839 T3 & CN 104611624 A *; | [A]JP2015062910 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-17 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015526586 (Exxonmobil Research and Engineering Co.) [A] 1-17* , & WO 2013/155367 A1 & CA 2869406 A1 & CN 104302741 A & KR 10-2015-0008103 A * |