Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10836841 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B2 | US2019127495 | 02.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | US201716091431 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180123585 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022068188 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | JP2018552830 | 04.04.2017 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019513866 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108884185 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3018778 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3440116 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2019 | A4 | EP3440116 | 13.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018012259 | 07.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 | WO2017US25857 | 04.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017176686 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662318387 | 05.04.2016 |