EP3439569 - PATIENT INTERFACE DEVICE FOR LASER METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lensar, Inc. 2800 Discovery Drive Suite 100 Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEUMA, E., Valas 624 Waterscape Way Orlando, FL 32828 / US | 02 /
MCWHIRTER, John 1790 Alabama Drive Winter Park, FL 32789 / US | 03 /
BROWNELL, Michael 99 VisaSonrisa San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2019/17] |
Former [2019/07] | 01 /
TEUMA, E., Valas 1115 Ballyshannon Pkwy. Orlando, FL 32828 / US | ||
02 /
MCWHIRTER, John 1790 Alabama Drive Winter Park, FL 32789 / US | |||
03 /
BROWNELL, Michael 99 VisaSonrisa San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | Representative(s) | btb IP Bungartz Baltzer Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2019/07] | Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 17779866.7 | 06.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017US26440 | Priority number, date | US201662319728P | 07.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662319728 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017177061 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439569 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439569 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/20, A61F9/00, A61F9/007, A61F9/008, A61F9/009, A61F9/013 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
A61F9/013 (EP,CN);
A61F9/008 (CN,KR,US);
A61F9/009 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B18/20 (CN,KR,US);
A61F2009/00865 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61F2009/0087 (CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR LASERVERFAHREN UND SYSTEME | [2019/07] | English: | PATIENT INTERFACE DEVICE FOR LASER METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2019/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE PATIENT POUR PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES LASER | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 30.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23150132.1 / EP4179992 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | LU | 06.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 06.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 06.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 06.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9803136 (KERAVISION INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1350492 (GEBAUER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO2005011547 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al); | [XAY]US2014276673 (HEITEL ROBERT G [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2011112519 (DONITZKY CHRISTOF [DE], et al); | [Y]US2012191077 (MROCHEN MICHAEL [CH], et al); | [XY]US2015088175 (MCWHIRTER JOHN [US], et al) | Examination | EP3419573 | by applicant | WO9803136 | US2007173794 | US2010022994 | US2011022035 | US2011190739 | US2011187995 | US8262646 | US8382745 | US8480659 | US8708491 | US8801186 | US2014276673 | US2015088175 | US9180051 |