EP3453052 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING DISPLAY SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Dejiang No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17779989.7 | 17.04.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017CN80760 | Priority number, date | CN201610286520 | 03.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610286520 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017190585 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453052 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/56 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
H01L27/1266 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (CN,US);
H10K59/122 (EP,CN,US);
H10K59/173 (EP);
H10K71/135 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/15 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | H01L27/32, H01L21/84, H01L51/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES ANZEIGESUBSTRATS | [2019/11] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING DISPLAY SUBSTRATE | [2019/11] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2017 | Translation filed | 16.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2017 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 16.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006071938 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [XY]US2016118619 (WANG DAN [CN]) | International search | [A]US2006187399 (KIM MIN-JOO [KR], et al); | [XA]CN101029947 (YOUDA PHOTOELECTRIC CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN102428395 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]CN103413819 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [A]CN103413819 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [XA]CN104167430 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [XA]CN104393192 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [PX]CN105826355 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) |