EP3515989 - HYDROCARBON-BASED MIX SUITABLE FOR INTEGRATING A HEAT EXCHANGER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurovia 18, place de l'Europe 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states Eurovia SA 18, Place de l'Europe 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUCON-DUMONT, Stéphane 3 avenue du Maréchal Leclerc 33127 Martignas sur Jalles / FR | 02 /
GIANETTI, Thomas 188 avenue Louis Barthou Appartement 209 33200 Bordeaux / FR | 03 /
PIRAUD, Florian "Les Patios de la Morandière" Appartement E53 32 Rue de la Morandière 33185 Le Haillan / FR | [2019/44] |
Former [2019/41] | 01 /
FAUCON-DUMONT, Stéphane 3 avenue du Maréchal Leclerc 33127 Martignas sur Jalles / FR | ||
02 /
GIANETTI, Thomas 188 avenue Louis Barthou Appartement 209 33200 Bordeaux / FR | |||
03 /
PIRAUD, Florian "Les Patios de la Morandière" Appartement E53 320rue de la Morandière 33185 Le Haillan / FR | |||
Former [2019/31] | 01 /
FAUCON-DUMONT, Stéphane 3 avenue du Maréchal Leclerc 33127 Martignas sur Jalles / FR | ||
02 /
GIANETTI, Thomas 188 avenue Louis Barthou Appartement 209 33200 Bordeaux / FR | |||
03 /
PIRAUD, Florian 15 rue de la Liberté 33185 Le Haillan / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 17780511.6 | 26.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017FR52587 | Priority number, date | FR20160059055 | 26.09.2016 Original published format: FR 1659055 | [2019/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018055315 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3515989 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3515989 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/48] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3515989 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K2003/265 (EP,US);
C08K2201/005 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08L2555/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L95/00 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08K2201/005 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUR INTEGRATION EINER WÄRMETAUSCHERVORRICHTUNG GEEIGNETE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFBASIERTE MISCHUNG | [2019/31] | English: | HYDROCARBON-BASED MIX SUITABLE FOR INTEGRATING A HEAT EXCHANGER DEVICE | [2019/31] | French: | ENROBE HYDROCARBONE ADAPTE POUR INTEGRER UN DISPOSITIF POUR ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 25.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2021 | Observations by third parties | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2017 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | MT | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 26.09.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 26.09.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.09.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]FR2984876 (EUROVIA [FR]) [I] 1-18* the whole document * | by applicant | FR2852018 | WO2006119354 | WO2007143016 | EP2062941 | WO2011153267 | other | WO9934155 | WO2015091890 | - anonymous, "PN Mure RD1215E1 - ARSAC (33)", COTITA, BORDEAUX, (20171011), URL: http://www.cotita.fr/IMG/pdf/08-Atelier_3bis_PN_MURE_CD33.pdf, XP055771331 | - anonymous, "NF T54-021, NF EN ISO 2505", AFNOR, (200509), XP055771344 |