EP3519014 - SYSTEM FOR PREDICTING MOTOR WEAR OUT IN INFUSION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/32] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING MOTOR WEAR OUT IN INFUSION SYSTEMS | ||
[2023/46] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONSIGLIO, Ronald Paul c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/24] |
Former [2019/32] | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17781193.2 | 22.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017IB55757 | Priority number, date | US201662401320P | 29.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662401320 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060821 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519014 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3519014 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/145, A61M5/168, A61M5/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61M5/16831 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61M5/1452 (EP,US);
G16H40/40 (US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3365 (EP,US);
A61M2205/702 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (EP,US);
H02P2203/09 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VORHERSAGE VON MOTORVERSCHLEISS IN INFUSIONSSYSTEMEN | [2024/06] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PREDICTING MOTOR WEAR OUT IN INFUSION SYSTEMS | [2023/46] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LA PRÉDICTION DE L'USURE DANS SYSTÈMES DE PERFUSION | [2023/46] |
Former [2019/32] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DES MOTORVERSCHLEISSES IN INFUSIONSSYSTEMEN | ||
Former [2019/32] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING MOTOR WEAR OUT IN INFUSION SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2019/32] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE L'USURE D'UN MOTEUR DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE PERFUSION | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 29.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6362591 (MOBERG SHELDON [US]); | [X]GB2428745 (FURUNO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [X]WO2010076275 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) |