EP3445005 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ALLOCATING VIRTUAL ARTICLES, AND SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/02] |
Former [2019/08] | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Chunxiao Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, He Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17781811.9 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017CN78932 | Priority number, date | CN201610235617 | 14.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610235617 | [2019/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017177835 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3445005 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/08 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0235 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0619 (KR);
H04L51/046 (CN);
G06Q20/0655 (US);
G06Q20/3674 (US);
G06Q30/0219 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
H04L47/34 (KR);
H04L47/78 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/08] | H04L12/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON VIRTUELLEN ARTIKELN UND SERVER | [2019/08] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ALLOCATING VIRTUAL ARTICLES, AND SERVER | [2019/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ALLOCATION D'ARTICLES VIRTUELS, ET SERVEUR | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2018 | Translation filed | 09.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.02.2022 | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/27] | 24.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013185127 (ROEDEN MARTIN [SE]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1,2 ** paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0 28] - [0060] - [0 82] - [0084] *; | [I]US2015310471 (KOTOROV RADOSLAV P [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 34] , [0 43] * | International search | [A]US2012101883 (AKHTER PERVEZ [US], et al) [A] 1-24* , the whole document *; | [A]CN104618226 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN105302907 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * , abstract, and description, paragraphs [0003] and [0053]-[0070], and claims 1-16, and figures 1-3 * |