EP3444062 - LASER PROCESSING DEVICE AND LASER PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amada Holdings Co., Ltd. 200 Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAI Norio 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | 02 /
TAKANO Hiroshi 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA Takahiro 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA Ko 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17782456.2 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017JP15075 | Priority number, date | JP20160082050 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016082050 | JP20170076866 | 07.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017076866 | [2019/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017179643 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3444062 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3444062 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, // B23K101/18, B23K101/34 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
B23K26/38 (EP,US);
B23K26/28 (US);
B23K26/0884 (US);
B23K26/244 (US);
B23K26/361 (EP,US);
B23K26/362 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/08] | B23K26/38, B23K26/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LASERBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/08] | English: | LASER PROCESSING DEVICE AND LASER PROCESSING METHOD | [2019/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT LASER ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT LASER | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2018 | Translation filed | 13.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 05.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2017 | AL | 13.01.2021 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | DK | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | ES | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | IT | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | MT | 13.01.2021 | NL | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SE | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | TR | 13.01.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | GB | 13.04.2021 | IE | 13.04.2021 | LU | 13.04.2021 | NO | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
TR | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001212681 (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0012]; figure - *; | [A]US2012312481 (KANG JI-HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0053] - [0055]; figure - *; | [A]JP2013022608 (DISCO CORP) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0013] - [0014]; figure - *; | [Y]JP2014097519 (AMADA CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07241688 (FANUC LTD) [A] 1-10* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001212681 (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010194602 (OGATA ESUMETSUKU KK) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014097519 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |