EP3444500 - FRICTION TRANSMISSION BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuboshi Belting Ltd. 1-21 Hamazoe-dori 4-chome Nagata-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 653-0024 / JP | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIGURO, Hisato c/o Mitsuboshi Belting Ltd. 1-21 Hamazoe-dori 4-chome Nagata-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 653-0024 / JP | 02 /
TOMODA, Takuya c/o Mitsuboshi Belting Ltd. 1-21 Hamazoe-dori 4-chome Nagata-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 653-0024 / JP | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17782501.5 | 14.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017JP15257 | Priority number, date | JP20160082464 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016082464 | JP20170078433 | 11.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017078433 | [2019/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017179688 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3444500 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3444500 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16G1/08, F16G5/06, F16G5/20 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
F16G5/08 (EP,US);
B29D29/106 (EP,US);
B32B25/02 (EP,US);
B32B25/042 (EP);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B25/16 (EP);
B32B3/263 (US);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/026 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
F16G1/08 (EP,US);
F16G1/10 (EP,US);
F16G5/06 (EP,US);
F16G5/20 (EP,US);
B29K2507/04 (US);
B29K2509/02 (US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/12 (EP);
B32B2262/14 (EP);
B32B2264/1021 (EP);
B32B2264/108 (EP);
B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/552 (EP);
B32B2307/554 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIBUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSBAND | [2019/08] | English: | FRICTION TRANSMISSION BELT | [2019/08] | French: | COURROIE DE TRANSMISSION À FROTTEMENT | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2018 | Translation filed | 12.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 14.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0419055 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,6,8 * table 1 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP2322820 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * tables 1,2,6 * * paragraph [0089] *; | [A]EP2584217 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,6 * examples A1, A2; table 1 * * examples Belt 1, Belt 2; table 3 * * figure 1 *; | [IY]EP2719824 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1,2,5-7 * examples 4,5,7,8,9; table 1 * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0064]; table 4 * * paragraph [0069] * * claims 1,6,9,14 * * paragraph [0045] * [Y] 3,4,8; | [YA]EP2824363 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0060] * * table 1 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0088] * [A] 1,6; | [Y]WO2016038854 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] * | International search | [Y]JPH03209037 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 1-8 * , pages 1 to 5; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2003096407 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0055]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007239821 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0070]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2009/0011884 A1 paragraphs [0001] to [0144]; fig. 1 to 2 & WO 2007/102310 A1 & CN 101395401 A *; | [XY]JP2008261473 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [X] 1-4, 8 * , paragraphs [0060] to [0077] (Family: none) *[Y] 5-7 |