EP3442478 - CERVICAL TRACTION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Savage, Elton Devin Charles Lindbergh Strasse 11 71034 Boeblingen / DE | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Peters, Andreas Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17782836.5 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017US24899 | Priority number, date | US201615095307 | 11.04.2016 Original published format: US201615095307 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017180330 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442478 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/058, A61F5/05, A61B17/70 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
A61H1/0218 (EP,US);
A61F5/042 (EP,US);
A61H1/0296 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0161 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0192 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1604 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Title | German: | ZERVIXTRAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/08] | English: | CERVICAL TRACTION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USING SAME | [2019/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRACTION CERVICALE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2620616 (FABRICATION MATERIEL ORTHOPEDI [FR]) [X] 1-6,9-15 * figures 1-6; claims 1-9 *; | [X]JP2001161730 (MORISAWA YUICHIRO) [X] 1-4,7-15 * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US4951655 (MACMILLAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-5; claims 1-11 *; | [X]US3814087 (HEIKES N) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,13-15 * figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US2574282 (PHILIPS JOHN D) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-15 * figures 1-7; claims 1-7 *; | [X]RU2270650 (*) [X] 1-4,9,11-13 * figures 2-3; claims 1-17 * | International search | [XY]US3814087 (HEIKES N) [X] 1-4, 6-10, 12-19 * entire document * [Y] 5, 11, 20; | [Y]US2014188027 (JABER HASSAN M H [SA]) [Y] 5, 20 * entire document *; | [Y]US4977905 (KITTELSEN JON D [US], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document * |