EP3692601 - ULTRA COMPACT RADIATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEGADOR ALVAREZ, Juan c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
TANG, Tao c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
GUNTUPALLI, Ajay Babu Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 04 /
BISCONTINI, Bruno c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/18] |
Former [2020/33] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17783505.5 | 12.10.2017 | [2020/33] | WO2017EP76059 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019072391 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692601 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3692601 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/28, H01Q21/24, H01Q5/314, H01Q5/49, H01Q1/36, H01Q21/26 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
H01Q5/314 (EP);
H01Q5/357 (US);
H01Q1/36 (EP);
H01Q21/24 (US);
H01Q21/26 (EP);
H01Q5/49 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAKOMPAKTES STRAHLUNGSELEMENT | [2020/33] | English: | ULTRA COMPACT RADIATING ELEMENT | [2020/33] | French: | ÉLÉMENT RAYONNANT ULTRA COMPACT | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 07.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2017 | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | IE | 12.10.2022 | LU | 12.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | FR | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 12.10.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.10.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.10.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.10.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.10.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2004263392 (BISIULES PETER JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0017] , [0073] - [0075] - [ 0080] - [0091] - [0095] , [ 0112] - [0116]; figures 1,2a-c,3a-e,6a, 10 * [Y] 7-9,13 [I] 6,11,12,14; | [YA]EP3166178 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 7-9,13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0037] - [ 0040] - [0041] - [ 0073] - [0086]; figures 1a,1c,4a,4b,4c,4d,4e,6a, 6b, 6c, 7a, 7b, 8 * [A] 4; | [A]EP3168927 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [ 0023] - [0025] - [0028]; figure 1 *; | [A] - BI QUN WU ET AL, "A Broadband Dual-Polarized Magneto-Electric Dipole Antenna With Simple Feeds", IEEE ANTENNAS AND WIRELESS PROPAGATION LETTERS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090417), vol. 8, doi:10.1109/LAWP.2008.2011656, ISSN 1536-1225, pages 60 - 63, XP011330895 [A] 14 * pages 60-63; figures 1,5; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LAWP.2008.2011656 |