EP3516086 - METHOD OF COATING AN ARTICLE, PASTE AND PLUG FOR PREVENTING HOLE BLOCKAGE DURING COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2022/51] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Jianzhi 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
PAN, Zhida 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
EMINOGLU, Cem Murat 300 Garlington Road Greenville SC 29615 / US | 04 /
HARDWICKE, Canan Uslu 300 Garlington Road Greenville SC 29615 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Liming 300 Garlington Road Greenville SC 29615 / US | 06 /
CAO, Lei 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
PENG, Wenqing 1800 Cai Lun Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex/ Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2019/31] | Freigutpartners IP Law Firm Hahnrainweg 4 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17784065.9 | 15.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017US51726 | Priority number, date | CN201610846983 | 23.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610846983 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018057414 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516086 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3516086 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/01, F01D5/28, C23C4/134 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
C23C4/01 (EP,US);
B05D1/32 (CN);
C09D1/00 (US);
B05C21/005 (US);
B05D1/08 (US);
B05D3/002 (US);
B05D3/007 (US);
C04B24/10 (US);
C04B28/00 (CN);
C04B28/26 (US);
C04B28/342 (US);
C04B28/344 (CN);
C23C4/134 (EP,US);
F01D5/28 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00663 (US);
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/00, C04B24/10, C04B14/306, C04B14/046 (CN);
C04B28/344, C04B24/10, C04B14/303, C04B14/046 (CN);
C04B28/344, C04B24/10, C04B14/306, C04B14/046 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES ARTIKELS, PASTE UND STOPFEN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON LOCHVERSTOPFUNG WÄHREND DER BESCHICHTUNG | [2019/31] | English: | METHOD OF COATING AN ARTICLE, PASTE AND PLUG FOR PREVENTING HOLE BLOCKAGE DURING COATING | [2019/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT D'UN ARTICLE, PÂTE ET BOUCHON DESTINÉS À EMPÊCHER L'OBSTRUCTION D'UN TROU PENDANT LE REVÊTEMENT | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 23.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | IE | 15.09.2023 | LU | 15.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6024787 (LEE YUH-WEN [TW]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]EP2662469 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-20 * claims 1, 6-7 *; | [A]EP2881489 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0020] *; | [XP]EP3156513 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * |