EP3519544 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ULTRA-LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nouryon Chemicals Finland Oy Kuhnamontie 2 44100 Äänekoski / FI | [2024/45] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Nouryon Chemicals Finland Oy Kuhnamontie 2 44100 Äänekoski / FI | ||
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states CP Kelco Oy Kuhnamontie 2 44100 Äänekoski / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNIAINEN, Marko Pohjantie 36 44120 Äänekoski / FI | 02 /
HAKKARAINEN, Pirkko-Leena Lustilantie 19-A 41160 Huutomäki / FI | 03 /
HANZEN, Andries Kolkakkerweg 64 6713DE Ede / NL | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2024/45] |
Former [2019/32] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17784205.1 | 27.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP74520 | Priority number, date | US201662400752P | 28.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662400752 P | US201762519687P | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519687 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060262 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519544 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3519544 | Date: | 06.11.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C11D3/225 (EP,US);
C11D1/008 (US);
C11D1/02 (RU);
C11D1/66 (RU);
C11D3/0036 (US);
C11D3/22 (RU);
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D3/228 (US);
C11D3/37 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT POLYSACCHARIDEN MIT EXTREM NIEDRIGEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [2019/32] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ULTRA-LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYSACCHARIDES | [2019/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DÉTERGENTES COMPRENANT DES POLYSACCHARIDES À POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE ULTRA-FAIBLE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 17.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0100125 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0511540 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO9829528 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2010075887 (WANG XIAORU JENNY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0107]; examples 1,2; tables 1-3 *; | [AD]US7842658 (GUCKENBIEHL BERNHARD [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* claims 1,4 * | by applicant | EP0382577 | GB2281073 | EP0708113 | US6054511 | US6600033 | WO2005012540 | US2005209449 | US2008108541 | US2010063269 | US7842658 | US8642529 | WO2014052317 | EP2302025 |