EP3525660 - DETECTION AND MEASUREMENT OF BREATHING USING AN OPTICAL CAMERA AND PROJECTED SHADOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENEGAS, Julien High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KRUEGER, Sascha High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
WIRTZ, Daniel High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
JEANNE, Vincent High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
KANAGASABAPATHI, Thirukumaran, Thangaraj High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
KERSTEN, Gerrit, Maria High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/51] |
Former [2019/34] | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17784268.9 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017EP75997 | Priority number, date | US201662406458P | 11.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662406458 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069419 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525660 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3525660 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/113, A61B5/08, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B6/00, G01R33/565, G01R33/28, // A61B5/055, A61B6/03, G01R33/567 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A61B5/113 (EP,US);
A61B5/0033 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/1128 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/527 (EP,US);
A61B6/541 (EP,US);
G01R33/283 (EP,US);
G01R33/56509 (EP,US);
G01R33/5673 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | A61B5/00, A61B5/08, A61B5/113, A61B5/11, A61B6/00, G01R33/565, A61B6/03, A61B5/055 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTION UND MESSUNG DER ATMUNG MITHILFE EINER OPTISCHEN KAMERA UND PROJIZIERTER SCHATTEN | [2019/34] | English: | DETECTION AND MEASUREMENT OF BREATHING USING AN OPTICAL CAMERA AND PROJECTED SHADOWS | [2019/34] | French: | DÉTECTION ET MESURE DE RESPIRATION À L'AIDE D'UNE CAMÉRA OPTIQUE ET D'OMBRES PROJETÉES | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 13.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5107845 (GUERN YVES F C [FR], et al) [A] 6,13 * column 6, lines 11-40 *; | [A]US2003188757 (YANOF JEFFREY H [US], et al) [A] 8,15* paragraph [0058] *; | [XI]US2006025672 (SENDAI TOMONARI [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,17,19 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] , [0015] , [0021] - [0022] - [0041] - [0044] - [0052] * [I] 4-7,9-16,18,20; | [X]WO2009075559 (MIMOS BERHAD [MY], et al) [X] 1,2,17 * page 6, lines 11-20 * * page 7, lines 13-20 * * page 8, lines 4-7 *; | [A]JP2012085915 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 8-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] - [0014] * |