EP3447741 - ASSEMBLED NOTE-ISSUING APPARATUS, AND FINANCIAL SELF-SERVICE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRG Banking Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 9&11 Kelin Road Science City High-Tech Industry Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Guocheng 9 Kelin Road Science City High-Tech Industry Development Zone Guangzhou City Guangdong 510663 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Hexiang 9 Kelin Road Science City High-Tech Industry Development Zone Guangzhou City Guangdong 510663 / CN | 03 /
WU, Changhai 9 Kelin Road Science City High-Tech Industry Development Zone Guangzhou City Guangdong 510663 / CN | 04 /
CEN, Changan 9 Kelin Road Science City High-Tech Industry Development Zone Guangzhou City Guangdong 510663 / CN | 05 /
WEI, Dong 9 Kelin Road Science City High-Tech Industry Development Zone Guangzhou City Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Thorsten Meyer Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrer-Schultes-Weg 14 89077 Ulm / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17785326.4 | 01.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017CN79333 | Priority number, date | CN201610243986 | 19.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610243986 | [2019/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017181841 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447741 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00, B65H3/06, G07D11/14, G07D11/10 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
B41J2/325 (EP,US);
B65H1/14 (EP,US);
B65H1/266 (EP,US);
B65H3/0684 (EP,US);
B65H3/54 (EP,US);
B65H31/22 (EP,US);
G07D11/00 (RU);
G07D11/10 (EP,US);
G07D11/13 (CN,US);
G07D11/14 (EP,US);
G07D11/235 (US);
B65H2301/4212 (EP,US);
B65H2402/45 (EP,US);
B65H2403/41 (EP,US);
B65H2405/11152 (EP,US);
B65H2405/121 (EP,US);
B65H2405/313 (EP,US);
B65H2553/42 (EP,US);
B65H2601/321 (EP,US);
B65H2601/325 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US);
G07D2211/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | G07D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | MONTIERTE BANKNOTENAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG UND FINANZIELLE SELBSTBEDIENUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/09] | English: | ASSEMBLED NOTE-ISSUING APPARATUS, AND FINANCIAL SELF-SERVICE APPARATUS | [2019/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉLIVRANCE DE BILLETS DE BANQUE ASSEMBLÉ, ET APPAREIL DE LIBRE-SERVICE FINANCIER | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2018 | Translation filed | 19.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO8501603 (NCR CO [US]) [X] 1,10 * figure 1 * [I] 2-9; | [A]US5172643 (KOSHIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * figures 5a, 5b *; | [XI]US5248207 (YAMAMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [I] 4-7; | [XI]US5410639 (GRUEL HENRI [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 5 * [I] 2,3,6-9; | [A]US6089563 (TAKASHIMIZU YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 6,7 * figure 7 *; | [A]CN105160751 (GUANGZHOU HAOQI ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 8,9* figures 3, 4 * | International search | [A]CN2463172Y (XINGHUA AGRICULTURAL IND AND C [CN]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [XY]CN103264584 (JIANGSU TIANSHI ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1, 4-6, 10 * , description, paragraphs [0016]-[0025], and figures 1 and 2, description, paragraphs [0016]-[0025], and figures 1 and 2 * [Y] 8, 9; | [A]CN103317857 (AGRICULTURAL BANK CHINA) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN204229508U (GLORY KOGYO KK) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN105160751 (GUANGZHOU HAOQI ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 8, 9 * , description, paragraphs [0017]-[0019] and [0022], and figures 1-7 *; | [A]KR20160027584 (NAUTILUS HYOSUNG INC [KR]) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN105931364 (GRG BANKING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 * |