EP3446952 - GENERAL-PURPOSE SIX-LEGGED WALKING ROBOT, AND MAIN STRUCTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun, Tianqi Room 2702 Wangjing SOHO T3-A Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17785459.3 | 20.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017CN81300 | Priority number, date | CN201610251448 | 21.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610251448 | CN201610251449 | 21.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610251449 | CN201620339950U | 21.04.2016 Original published format: CN 201620339950 U | CN201620340502U | 21.04.2016 Original published format: CN 201620340502 U | [2019/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017181975 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446952 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3446952 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D57/032 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B62D57/032 (EP,US);
G05D1/0246 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLER SECHSBEINIGER LAUFROBOTER UND AUFBAU DAFÜR | [2019/09] | English: | GENERAL-PURPOSE SIX-LEGGED WALKING ROBOT, AND MAIN STRUCTURE THEREOF | [2019/09] | French: | ROBOT MARCHEUR À SIX JAMBES POLYVALENT, ET SA STRUCTURE PRINCIPALE | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2018 | Translation filed | 14.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 02.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2017 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | ES | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | IT | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | MT | 09.06.2021 | NL | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | TR | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
TR | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 20.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 20.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 20.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8707009 (DENNING MOBILE ROBOTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN102795276B (UNIV LIAONING TECHNICAL) [A] 1-15* figure 4 * | International search | [A]DE4441586 (SCHROETER WOLFGANG DIPL ING [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN104527831 (NORTH CHINA INST SCI & TECH) [A] 1-17 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-2 *; | [X]CN105172933 (UNIV CHANGAN) [X] 1-2, 7-17 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-6 *; | [PX]CN105774941 (VINCROSS (BEIJING) TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-8 *; | [PX]CN105857433 (QINU (BEIJING) TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-7 *; | [PX]CN205499112U (VINCROSS (BEIJING) TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN205497534U (VINCROSS (BEIJING) TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures 1-5 * |