EP3447082 - HIGHLY DIELECTRIC FILM, USAGES THEREOF, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Toray Co., Ltd. 2-24, Higashishinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI Hiroshi c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 02 /
MASATOMI Toru c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 03 /
TSUDA Takeaki c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17785880.0 | 12.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017JP15028 | Priority number, date | JP20160086460 | 22.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016086460 | [2019/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017183541 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447082 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B27/00, H01B3/46 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
H01B19/04 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/283 (US);
B32B27/286 (US);
C08G77/08 (KR);
C08G77/12 (KR);
C08G77/20 (KR);
C08G77/24 (KR,US);
C08J7/042 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
H01B19/00 (US);
H01B3/46 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2307/204 (US);
B32B2457/208 (US);
C08G77/70 (US);
C08J2383/08 (US);
C08J2483/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | HOCH DIELEKTRISCHER FILM, VERWENDUNG DAVON UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/09] | English: | HIGHLY DIELECTRIC FILM, USAGES THEREOF, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/09] | French: | FILM HAUTEMENT DIÉLECTRIQUE, SES UTILISATIONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2018 | Translation filed | 21.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1101810 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0039]; example -; claim - *; | [XDI]US2015344671 (FURUKAWA HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [XD] 1,3-5,9-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0132] , [0137] , [0144] , [0145] , [0148] , [0166] , [0169]; table 1 * [I] 2,6-8,16-20; | [A] - YAN ZHENLONG ET AL, "Synthesis and properties of a novel UV-cured fluorinated siloxane graft copolymer for improved surface, dielectric and tribological properties of epoxy acrylate coating", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130807), vol. 284, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2013.07.156, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 683 - 691, XP028710425 [A] 1-20 * Scheme 1, Experimental;; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2013.07.156 | International search | [A]JPH0570747 (DOW CORNING) [A] 1-20 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XA]JPH08506841 (Bausch & Lomb Inc.) [X] 1-3, 8, 20 * , claims; page 14, lines 4 to 10; page 30, line 9 to page 32, line 27; table 1 & US 5321108 A claims; column 1, lines 5 to 14; column 11, line 22 to column 13, line 11; table 1 & EP 683799 A1 & CN 1117739 A * [A] 4-7, 9-19; | [XA]JP2001139894 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE) [X] 1-2, 4, 7-15, 19-20 * , claims 1 to 2; paragraphs [0001], [0004], [0008] to [0011], [0016], [0020] to [0022], [0027] to [0028], [0031] to [0033], [0038] & EP 1101810 A2 claims 1 to 2; paragraphs [0001], [0004] to [0006], [0010] to [0014], [0019], [0023] to [0024], [0034] to [0035], [0038] to [0040] & KR 10-2001-0051669 A * [A] 3, 5-6, 16-18; | [A]JP2003113244 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-20 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003307601 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-20 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013001791 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-20 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2016098334 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [PA] 1-20* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2016163069 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-20 * , entire text (Family: none) * | by applicant | WO9406878 | US5436303 | US7253238 | JP2010502781 | JP2010108490 | JP2011222679 | JP5066078B | JP2013512326 | JP2013065009 | WO2014105959 | JP2014522436 | WO2015JP06198 | WO2016JP01299 |