EP3445222 - SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING ENERGY DELIVERY IN MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/09] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING ENERGY DELIVERY IN MEDICAL DEVICES | ||
[2023/27] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Apama Medical, Inc. 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYONS, Gerald 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
SALAHIEH, Amr 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 03 /
LUNDBERG, Daniel 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 04 /
AVISA, Ron 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 05 /
MCNALLY, Guy 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 06 /
SCHILERU, Rodica 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 07 /
BRETON, Thomas 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 08 /
MERCHANT, Adnan 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 09 /
CLAUDE, John 745A Camden Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2024/12] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
LYONS, Gerald 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | ||
02 /
SALAHIEH, Amr 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
03 /
LUNDBERG, Daniel 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
04 /
AVISA, Ron 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
05 /
MCNALLY, Guy 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
06 /
SCHILERU, Rodica 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
07 /
BRETON, Thomas 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
08 /
MERCHANT, Adnan 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | |||
09 /
CLAUDE, John 745A Camden Avenue Campbell CA 95008 / US | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17786483.2 | 18.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017US28174 | Priority number, date | US201662324175P | 18.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662324175 P | US201762484378P | 11.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762484378 P | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017184628 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3445222 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3445222 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/05, A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A61B34/25 (EP);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B1/00045 (EP);
A61B1/05 (EP);
A61B2018/0016 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (EP);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00654 (EP);
A61B2018/00672 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00708 (EP);
A61B2018/0072 (US);
A61B2018/00755 (US);
A61B2018/00767 (US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP);
A61B2018/00898 (EP);
A61B2018/126 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR STEUERUNG DER ENERGIEABGABE BEI MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/27] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING ENERGY DELIVERY IN MEDICAL DEVICES | [2023/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/09] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR STEUERUNG DER ENERGIEABGABE BEI MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/09] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING ENERGY DELIVERY IN MEDICAL DEVICES | ||
Former [2019/09] | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1169976 (BIOSENSE INC [US]) [Y] 11-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0070]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2010049031 (FRULAND BENJAMIN R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XYI]US2014171942 (WERNETH RANDELL L [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0048] - [0075] - [0090] - [0101]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 2-6,8-10; | [A]WO2015148470 (ACUTUS MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract * | International search | [A]US2012059367 (BUYSSE STEVEN P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [X]US2014171942 (WERNETH RANDELL L [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]US2015351836 (PRUTCHI DAVID [US]) [A] 1-16* entire document * |