EP3529420 - SEISMIC DEFENCE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LIMITED Level 1 Faculty Building c/o Imperial College, Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | For all designated states Université d'Aix-Marseille 58, Boulevard Charles Livon 13284 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Marseille Technopole de Château Gombert 38, Rue Frederic Joliot Curie 13013 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTONAKAKIS, Tryfon 3 chemin du Pré Fleuri 1228 Genève / CH | 02 /
CRASTER, Richard c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London, Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB | 03 /
ACHAOUI, Younes Département de Physique, Faculté de Sciences Meknès B.P. 11201, Avenue Zitoune Meknès / MA | 04 /
ENOCH, Stefan Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | 05 /
GUENNEAU, Sebastien Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | 06 /
BRULE, Stephane Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/51] | 01 /
ANTONAKAKIS, Tryfon 3 chemin du Pré Fleuri 1228 Genève / CH | ||
02 /
CRASTER, Richard c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London, Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
03 /
ACHAOUI, Younes Université de Franche-Comté CNRS ENSMM FEMTO-ST 25000 Besancon / FR | |||
04 /
ENOCH, Stefan Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | |||
05 /
GUENNEAU, Sebastien Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
BRULE, Stephane Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | |||
Former [2019/39] | 01 /
ANTONAKAKIS, Tryfon 3 chemin du Pré Fleuri 1228 Genève / CH | ||
02 /
CRASTER, Richard c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London, Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
03 /
ACHAOUI, Younes CNRS ENSMM FEMTO-ST 25000 Besancon / FR | |||
04 /
ENOCH, Stefan Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | |||
05 /
GUENNEAU, Sebastien Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
BRULE, Stephane Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | |||
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
ANTONAKAKIS, Tryfon 3 chemin du Pré Fleuri 1228 Genève / CH | ||
02 /
CRASTER, Richard c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London, Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
03 /
ACHAOUI, Younes Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
ENOCH, Stefan Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | |||
05 /
GUENNEAU, Sebastien Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
BRULE, Stephane Aix Marseille Univ, CNRS, Centrale Marseille Institut Fresnel 52 Avenue Escradille Normandie Niemen 13013 Marseille / FR | |||
Former [2019/35] | 01 /
ANTONAKAKIS, Tryfon c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London, Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB | ||
02 /
CRASTER, Richard c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London, Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
03 /
ACHAOUI, Younes Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
ENOCH, Stefan Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
GUENNEAU, Sebastien Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Rue Michele Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
BRULE, Stephane Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique 3 Avenue de Gadagne 69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/47] |
Former [2019/35] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17787180.3 | 20.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017EP76844 | Priority number, date | GB20160017808 | 21.10.2016 Original published format: GB 201617808 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073412 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3529420 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3529420 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E02D27/34, E04H9/02, G01V1/00, E02D27/12 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
E02D27/34 (EP);
E02D31/08 (US);
E04H9/02 (EP,US);
G01V1/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEISMISCHE VERTEIDIGUNGSSTRUKTUREN | [2019/35] | English: | SEISMIC DEFENCE STRUCTURES | [2019/35] | French: | STRUCTURES DE PROTECTION SISMIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 21.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH03103534 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1-7,11,15-19 * see whole document, in particular figures 1, 2 describing a seismic wave shield wall (7) aroudn a building, comprising steel pipes (8) rooted into top soil (2), hard strata (3) and bedrock (4). * [I] 8-10,12-14; | [XI]JPH04155018 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1-7,11,15-19 * see whole document, in particular figure 1, 2 describing a seismic wave shield wall (3) comprising steel pipes (5) rooted into hard statum (a) * [I] 8-10,12-14; | [XI]JP2008223302 (NISHIMATSU CONSTR CO LTD) [X] 1-7,11,15-19 * see whole document, in particular figures 1, 2 describing a seismic shield wall around a building, comprising steel pipes (3, 7) rooted into liquefaction layer (6) on the support ground (5). * [I] 8-10,12-14; | [XI]JP2014051852 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO) [X] 1-7,11,15-19 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0 37]; figures 8, 9 * [I] 8-10,12-14; | [XI]JP2014214509 (TAISEI CORP) [X] 1-7,11,13-19 * paragraphs [0031] - [0032] - [0 48] - [0051]; figures 1, 8, 12-14 *[I] 8-10,12 | Examination | - Ungureanu Bogdan ET AL, "POSSIBLE MEASURES OF TAKING-OVER / DYNAMIC CONTROL OF SEISMIC ACTIONS APPLICABLE TO URBAN UTILITY SYSTEMS. SEISMIC WAVES DEFLECTION / DAMPING USING METAMATERIALS", Buletinul AGIR Supliment 2 / 2015, (20150101), pages 184 - 194, URL: https://www.agir.ro/buletine/2288.pdf, (20220204), XP055887727 |