EP3532242 - SANDING-POLISHING MACHINE FOR PLATE-LIKE PRODUCTS MADE OF STONE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lo Piccolo, Rosario Via Maistri 14 Monte di Malo 36030 Vicenza / IT | For all designated states Tupini, Giovanni Via dei Vigna 30 36015 Schio (VI) / IT | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Lo Piccolo, Rosario Via Maistri 14 Monte di Malo 36030 Vicenza / IT | ||
For all designated states Tupini, Giovanni Via dei Vigna 30 Schio 36015 Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Bettello, Pietro Studio Tecnico Ing. Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/36] | Bettello, Pietro Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 17787201.7 | 25.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017EP77254 | Priority number, date | IT20160108003 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: IT201600108003 | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018077925 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532242 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3532242 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B24B7/06, B24B7/22, B24B41/047, B24B41/02 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
B24B7/06 (EP);
B24B41/02 (EP);
B24B41/047 (EP);
B24B41/0475 (EP);
B24B7/224 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEIF-POLIER-MASCHINE FÜR PLATTENFÖRMIGE, AUS STEINMATERIAL HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE | [2019/36] | English: | SANDING-POLISHING MACHINE FOR PLATE-LIKE PRODUCTS MADE OF STONE MATERIAL | [2019/36] | French: | MACHINE DE PONÇAGE-POLISSAGE POUR PRODUITS LAMELLAIRES CONSTITUÉS DE PIERRE | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 02.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 25.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | DE | 01.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
DE | 01.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
DE | 01.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN101362312 (KEDA IND CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-3, 6, 7 *; | [Y]WO2015087294 (TONCELLI LUCA [IT]) [Y] 1-6 * page 5, lines 17-25 * * page 11, lines 25-33 * * page 12, lines 21-26, 34 * * figures 6-8 *; | [A]CN104802051 (KEDA CLEAN ENERGY CO LTD) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016012950 (TONCELLI LUCA [IT]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | ITVI20030098 | CN101362312 | WO2015087294 | WO2016012950 |