EP3525678 - NON-INVASIVE METHOD FOR PRESSURE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas Jefferson University Innovation Pillar 925 Chestnut Street, Suite 110 Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | For all designated states Thomas Jefferson University 901 Walnut Street, 11th Floor Innovation Pillar Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | ||
For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | |||
Former [2024/17] | For all designated states Mike-O-Matic Industries LLC 156 13th Street Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | ||
For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | |||
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Thomas Jefferson University 901 Walnut Street Innovation Pillar Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US | ||
For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSBERG, Flemming 4139 Kottler Drive Lafayette Hill Pennsylvania 19444 / US | 02 /
MILLS, David 1 Research Circle Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | 03 /
EISENBREY, John R. 631 Summit Ave Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19128 / US | 04 /
WALLACE, Kirk 1 Research Circle Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | 05 /
GUPTA, Ipshita Satya Medical Centre A-98/A Sector 34 Noida 201301 / IN | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17787853.5 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US56154 | Priority number, date | US201662406797P | 11.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662406797 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071551 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525678 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/04, A61B8/08 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61B8/04 (EP,US);
A61B8/481 (EP,US);
A61B8/5223 (EP,US);
A61K49/223 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVES VERFAHREN ZUR DRUCKMESSUNG | [2019/34] | English: | NON-INVASIVE METHOD FOR PRESSURE MEASUREMENT | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ NON INVASIF DE MESURE DE LA PRESSION | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 29.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2019 | 31.10.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5552133 | WO2014001297 |