Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10892123 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2021 | B2 | US2020127661 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB55848 | 26.09.2017 | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102393171B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2022 | B1 | KR20190051048 | 14.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB55848 | 26.09.2017 | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7038423B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2022 | B2 | JP2019537193 | 19.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB55848 | 26.09.2017 | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109791855B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2021 | B | CN109791855 | 21.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB55848 | 26.09.2017 | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3516673 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2020 | B1 | EP3516673 | 31.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB55848 | 26.09.2017 | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019005761 | 11.06.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB55848 | 26.09.2017 | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018055598 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201600096402 | 26.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201600096402 | 26.09.2016 |