EP3526834 - CENTER CONTACT PLATE CONFIGURED TO ESTABLISH ELECTRICAL BONDS TO DIFFERENT GROUPS OF BATTERY CELLS IN A BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tiveni MergeCo, Inc. 730 Polhemus Rd Suite 2020 San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2020/25] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states INEVIT LLC 3303 Scott Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEES, Heiner INEVIT Inc. 541 Jefferson Street Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 02 /
TRACK, Andreas INEVIT Inc. 541 Jefferson Street Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 03 /
EICHHORN, Alexander INEVIT Inc. 541 Jefferson Street Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 04 /
MAISCH, Ralf INEVIT Inc. 541 Jefferson Street Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 05 /
DAMASKE, Jörg INEVIT Inc. 541 Jefferson Street Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 06 /
EBERHARD, Martin 541 Jefferson Street Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Suite 2 The Old Dairy Elm Farm Business Park Wymondham Norwich, Norfolk NR18 0SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Lakeside 300 Old Chapel Way Broadland Business Park Norwich, Norfolk NR7 0WG / GB | ||
Former [2019/34] | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Lakeside 300 Old Chapel Way Broadland Business Park, Norwich Norfolk NR7 0WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17788087.9 | 13.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US56523 | Priority number, date | US201662408428P | 14.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662408428 P | US201662408437P | 14.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662408437 P | US201662414263P | 28.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662414263 P | US201662414224P | 28.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662414224 P | US201662422097P | 15.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662422097 P | US201662422099P | 15.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662422099 P | US201662422113P | 15.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662422113 P | US201662431067P | 07.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662431067 P | US201662438800P | 23.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438800 P | US201715641786 | 05.07.2017 Original published format: US201715641786 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071772 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526834 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3526834 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M2/02, H01M2/04, B23K26/21, B60L50/64, B60L58/21, H01M2/30, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, // H01M10/6552, H01M10/643, B23K101/38, B60K1/00, H01M2/34 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
B23K26/21 (EP,CN,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/26 (US);
B60K1/00 (EP,US);
B60K1/04 (US);
B60K11/02 (EP);
B60L58/21 (EP,CN,US);
B62D21/152 (US);
B62D21/155 (US);
H01M10/625 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/6552 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/10 (US);
H01M50/107 (US);
H01M50/116 (US);
H01M50/147 (US);
H01M50/152 (EP,US);
H01M50/166 (US);
H01M50/171 (US);
H01M50/20 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/502 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/509 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/51 (US);
H01M50/516 (US);
H01M50/522 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/528 (US);
H01M50/529 (US);
H01M50/543 (US);
H01M50/545 (US);
H01M50/56 (EP,US);
H01M50/572 (EP,US);
B23K2101/36 (US);
B23K2101/38 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/001 (US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/0438 (US);
B60K2001/0461 (US);
B60Y2306/01 (US);
B62D21/18 (US);
F16M1/00 (US);
H01M2200/103 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/244 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | H01M2/10, H01M2/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRALE KONTAKTPLATTE MIT KONFIGURATION ZUR HERSTELLUNG ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDUNGEN ZU VERSCHIEDENEN GRUPPEN VON BATTERIEZELLEN IN EINEM BATTERIEMODUL | [2019/34] | English: | CENTER CONTACT PLATE CONFIGURED TO ESTABLISH ELECTRICAL BONDS TO DIFFERENT GROUPS OF BATTERY CELLS IN A BATTERY MODULE | [2019/34] | French: | PLAQUE DE CONTACT CENTRALE CONÇUE DE FAÇON À ÉTABLIR DES LIAISONS ÉLECTRIQUES ENTRE DIFFÉRENTS GROUPES D'ÉLÉMENTS DE BATTERIE DANS UN MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 14.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2017 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | IE | 13.10.2021 | LU | 13.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.10.2017 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
TR | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.10.2017 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.10.2017 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2613379 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2014017532 (NISHIHARA YOSHITOMO [JP], et al); | [XY]US2015179995 (NAKAMURA YOSHIKI [JP], et al); | [XY]US9147875 (COAKLEY KEVIN MICHAEL [US], et al) |