EP3548189 - APPLICATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broetje-Automation GmbH Am Autobahnkreuz 14 26180 Rastede / DE | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIDAN, Sergej Schwaikheimerstrasse 9 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17788215.6 | 24.10.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP77059 | Priority number, date | DE201610123416 | 05.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016123416 | [2019/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018103941 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548189 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/02, B25J11/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B05C5/0204 (EP,US);
B05C5/0216 (US);
B05C5/00 (RU);
B05C5/02 (RU);
B05C5/0262 (EP,US);
B05C17/00516 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | APPLIKATIONSEINHEIT | [2019/41] | English: | APPLICATION UNIT | [2019/41] | French: | UNITÉ D'APPLICATION | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 12.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0707937 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | [X]US2016271629 (PRINGLE IV JOHN WALTER [US], et al); | [XI]US2016325307 (ATSEBHA SOLOMON [US], et al) | by applicant | DE102013003688 |