EP3450397 - MSE-TYPE ZEOLITE PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 11-1, Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | For all designated states The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 11-1, Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | ||
For all designated states The University Of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITABASHI, Keiji c/o UniZeo Co. Ltd. The University of Tokyo Entrepreneur Plaza 703 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 02 /
ELANGOVAN, Shanmugam Palani c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 03 /
SOGUKKANLI, Sibel c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 04 /
OKUBO, Tatsuya c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17789623.0 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017JP16605 | Priority number, date | JP20160088588 | 26.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016088588 | [2019/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017188341 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450397 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3450397 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/48, B01J29/70, C01B39/04, // B01J29/80 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C01B39/48 (EP,US);
B01J29/70 (EP,US);
B01J37/10 (US);
C01B39/04 (EP,US);
B01J29/041 (US);
B01J29/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | C01B39/48, B01J29/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ZEOLITH VOM MSE-TYP | [2019/10] | English: | MSE-TYPE ZEOLITE PRODUCTION METHOD | [2019/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE ZÉOLITHE DE TYPE MSE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2018 | Translation filed | 13.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 03.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2017 | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | IT | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | TR | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | IE | 26.04.2022 | LU | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 26.04.2017 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
TR | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 26.04.2017 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.04.2017 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.04.2017 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
LU | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010081775 (MOSCOSO JAIME G [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * example 2 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 10] *; | [YD]EP2300370 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US]) [YD] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [0 29] , [0 37] , [0 40] * * example 183 *; | [Y]US2014140921 (BURTON ALLEN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * example 1 *; | [XP] - SOGUKKANLI SIBEL ET AL, "Rational seed-directed synthesis of MSE-type zeolites using a simple organic structure-directing agent by extending the composite building unit hypothesis", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, (20170228), vol. 245, doi:10.1016/J.MICROMESO.2017.02.073, ISSN 1387-1811, pages 1 - 7, XP029996935 [XP] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2017.02.073 | International search | [A]US8247631 (NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER P [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013129590 (NIPPON CHEMICAL IND, et al) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0040] to [0042]; example 19 & US 2014/0322126 A1 paragraphs [0059] to [0074]; example 19 & WO 2013/077404 A1 & EP 2784025 A1 & KR 10-2014-0094024 A & CN 104203824 A *; | [Y]JP2013212488 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [Y] 2 * , claims; paragraphs [0113] to [0117]; examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015534939 (Exxonmobil Research and Engineering Co.) [Y] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0010] to [0058]; examples & US 2014/0140921 A1 paragraphs [0010] to [0058]; examples; claims & WO 2014/077995 A1 & EP 2920113 A & CA 2887152 A & CN 104781191 A *; | [PX] - S. SOGUKKANLI et al., "Rational seed-directed synthesis of MSE-type zeolites using a simple organic structure-directing agent by extending the composite building unit hypothesis", Microporous and Mesoporous Materials, (20170228), vol. 245, pages 1 - 7, XP029996935 [PX] 1-5 * . Abstract, 2. Experimental section, 3. Results and discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2017.02.073 |