EP3450349 - CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikyo Seiko, LTD. 1305-1, Kurohakama-cho Sano-shi, Tochigi 327-0813 / JP | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Daikyo Seiko, LTD. 126-1, Kurohakama-Cho Sano-shi Tochigi 327-0813 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOGASHI Hiroshi c/o Daikyo Seiko, LTD. 1305-1 Kurohakama-cho Sano-shi Tochigi 3270813 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA Hideaki c/o Daikyo Seiko, LTD. 1305-1 Kurohakama-cho Sano-shi Tochigi 3270813 / JP | [2021/32] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
TOGASHI Hiroshi c/o Daikyo Seiko, Ltd. 126-1, Kurohakama-Cho, Sano-Shi Tochigi 3270813 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWAMURA Hideaki c/o Daikyo Seiko, Ltd. 126-1, Kurohakama-Cho, Sano-Shi Tochigi 3270813 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/39] |
Former [2019/10] | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17789708.9 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017JP16902 | Priority number, date | JP20160090235 | 28.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016090235 | [2019/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017188427 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450349 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3450349 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20, A61M5/00, B65D25/20, B65D81/20 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/001 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/00 (IL,US);
A61M5/008 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B65D75/36 (CN,IL);
A61B50/39 (IL,US);
A61L2/26 (IL,KR);
A61M5/002 (IL,KR,US);
B65D25/20 (IL,KR,US);
B65D77/20 (IL,KR,US);
B65D81/20 (IL,KR,US);
B65D85/68 (CN,IL);
A61L2202/18 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER | [2019/10] | English: | CONTAINER | [2019/10] | French: | RÉCIPIENT | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | Translation filed | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 03.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2020 | Observations by third parties | 20.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2022
22.06.2022
ADMISSIBLE A. RAYMOND ET CIE 113 Cours Berriat 38000 Grenoble / FR Opponent's representative IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2022/30] | 13.07.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.11.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.01.2024 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/24] | 18.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.02.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | MT | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | LU | 28.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005335782 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0020] *; | [XI]US2008183140 (PAPROSKI JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * [I] 3-4; | [XI]US2009100802 (BUSH EDWARD VANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * figure 9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 70] * [I] 3-4 | International search | [Y]JP2005335782 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0138]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006016005 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0033]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006036227 (KENEI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-4* , paragraphs [0027] to [0054]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013525218 (Stevanato Group International A.S.) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraph [0038]; fig. 3 & US 2013/0048531 A1 paragraph [0047]; fig. 3 & WO 2011/135085 A1 & EP 2429608 A *; | [A]JP3184488U (Nichiban Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0022]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2014109011 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraph [0025]; fig. 1 & JP 14-109011 A1 & US 2015/0182686 A1 paragraph [0042]; fig. 1 & EP 2944583 A1 * | Opposition | DE29705636U | US2004022674 | JP2005335782 | US2008183140 | US2009100802 | EP2119463 | WO2010062602 | WO2015023924 | - Anonymous, "Agenda", US Customer Event: Opening of RTU Excellence Center September 16th-17th, 2015, Lebanon/Hershey, PA, Lebanon/Hershey, PA, (20150916), US Customer Event: Opening of RTU Excellence Center September 16th-17th, 2015, (20220704), XP055938020 | - Schott, "Ready to Break the Mold?", The Medicine Maker, (20160322), URL: https://themedicinemaker.com/manufacture/ready-to-break-the-mold?logintype=logout&cHash=d767e6845c91c374f622f276550006bf, XP055938014 | - Anonymous, "They exhibit at Pharmapack Europe 2016", DOSES, (20160201), no. 62, XP055938018 |