|
13.05.2024 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2024 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2024 |
Request for correction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2024 |
Request for correction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2024 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
13.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
25 |
|
28.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
41 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
24 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
29 |
|
20.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
29 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
30 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
38 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2021 |
Rectification of the designation of the inventor under Rule 21 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
13.09.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
27 |