13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
10.05.2024 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
06.02.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
04.02.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
23.11.2022 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
12.07.2022 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
24.06.2022 |
Opposition filed |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
27.08.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
24.08.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
24.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.07.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
09.06.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.07.2020 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.09.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
05.07.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
05.07.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
01.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
01.02.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
01.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
08.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
29.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|