Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11540893 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2023 | B2 | US2021068915 | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816095812 | 23.10.2018 | US202016951352 | 18.11.2020 | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10874473 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | B2 | US2019125473 | 02.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102452207B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2022 | B1 | KR20190003511 | 09.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6863606B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2021 | B2 | JPWO2017188427 | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL262540 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2022 | B | IL262540 | 31.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111409954B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2022 | B | CN111409954 | 14.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201780026096 | 28.04.2017 | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109071091B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2021 | B | CN109071091 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3450349 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2021 | B1 | EP3450349 | 16.10.2019 | A4 | EP3450349 | 06.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3450349T | 20.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2895435T | 21.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201809347X | 29.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP16902 | 28.04.2017 | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017188427 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE056831T | 28.03.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | JP2016090235 | 28.04.2016 |