EP3448459 - PEN NEEDLE MAGAZINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Embecta Corp. 200 Bulfinch Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Sudarsan 41 Ireland Brook Drive North Brunswick, New Jersey 08902 / US | 02 /
CONSTANTINEAU, Cole 47 Cogswell Ave., Apt 14 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | 03 /
BRUEHWILER, Michel 14 Erie Avenue Newton, Massachusetts 02461 / US | 04 /
MONTIDORO, Tyson 445 Artisan Way 361 Somerville, Massachusetts 02145 / US | 05 /
CHAGNON, Jeffrey 38 Jay Street Apt. 3 Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | [2019/12] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Sudarsan 41 Ireland Brook Drive North Brunswick, New Jersey 08902 / US | ||
02 /
CONSTANTINEAU, Cole 44 Aberdeen Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | |||
03 /
BRUEHWILER, Michel 14 Erie Avenue Newton, Massachusetts 02461 / US | |||
04 /
MONTIDORO, Tyson 445 Artisan Way 361 Somerville, Massachusetts 02145 / US | |||
05 /
CHAGNON, Jeffrey 38 Jay Street Apt. 3 Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17790080.0 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US25378 | Priority number, date | US201662328680P | 28.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662328680 P | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017189170 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448459 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/162, A61M5/32, A61M5/28, A61M5/158, A61M5/34, A61M5/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61M5/34 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (US);
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
A61M5/3205 (EP,US);
A61M5/3297 (US);
A61B50/3001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | A61M5/162, A61M5/32, A61M5/28, A61M5/158, A61M5/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | STIFTNADELMAGAZIN | [2019/10] | English: | PEN NEEDLE MAGAZINE | [2019/10] | French: | MAGASIN D'AIGUILLES DE STYLO | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 01.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014339113 (HOFMANN VERENA [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0050] , [0 54] - [0059] - [0 64] *; | [A]US2015283333 (BUTLER JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 15 * figures 3, 6, 7 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 35] *; | [A]US2016000992 (STEEL SAMUEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] - [0 50] * | International search | [A]US2014339113 (HOFMANN VERENA [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * ; figures 1-2, 4A; paragraphs [0050], [0054]-[0059], [00641 *; | [A]US2015335827 (STEFANSEN MADS SCHENSTROEM [DK], et al) [A] 1-22* ; abstract; figures 1A-2B; paragraphs [0040]-[0041], [0047], [0050], [0052], [0058] *; | [A]US2016000992 (STEEL SAMUEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * ; abstract; figures 1-3; paragraphs [0041]-[0046], [0050] * | by applicant | US2014339113 | US2015283333 | US2016000992 |