EP3448567 - FLUIDIC PERISTALTIC LAYER PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haupt, Remus Brix Anders 3533 Dove Hollow Road Encinitas, California 92024 / US | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Dolphin, Kirsty Mairi Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17790351.5 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US29653 | Priority number, date | US201662327560P | 26.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662327560 P | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017189735 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448567 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3448567 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, F04B43/12, F04B19/00 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B01L3/50273 (EP,KR,US);
F04B19/006 (EP,KR,US);
F04B43/12 (EP,KR,US);
F04B43/1238 (US);
B01L2300/06 (KR);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | B01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDISCHE PERISTALTIKSCHICHTPUMPE | [2019/10] | English: | FLUIDIC PERISTALTIC LAYER PUMP | [2019/10] | French: | POMPE À COUCHE PÉRISTALTIQUE FLUIDIQUE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3038414 (MARGUS EDWARD A) [I] 6-11,13-15 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US4527323 (DAWSON JOHN R [US]) [A] 6-11,13-15* figure 2 *; | [IA]WO2014133624 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [I] 1-5,7-9,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0053] , [ 0055] , [ 0079]; figures 1, 3A * [A] 6,10,11,13 | International search | [A]US8388908 (BLAGA IULIU I [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 10-15 * entire document *; | [A]US8524174 (YOBAS LEVENT [SG], et al) [A] 1-5, 10-15* entire document *; | [A]US2015050172 (HAUPT REMUS [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 10-15 * entire document *; | [A]US9132423 (BATTRELL C FREDERICK [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 10-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2015306596 (THOMPSON GUY [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 10-15 * entire document * | by applicant | US3038414 | WO2014133624 |