EP3534883 - INSTANT RELEASE CAPSULE BASED ON HOT MELT EXTRUDED POLYVINYL ALCOHOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2019/37] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Mengyao Leo-Grewenig-Strasse 44 64625 Bensheim / DE | 02 /
KNUETTEL, Anja-Nadine Buchenweg 25 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17791111.2 | 01.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017EP77954 | Priority number, date | EP20160197614 | 07.11.2016 Original published format: EP 16197614 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018083113 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534883 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K31/00, A61K9/16 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/4866 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/146 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/4833 (KR);
A61P31/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | KAPSEL MIT SOFORTIGER FREIGABE AUF DER BASIS EINES HEISSSCHMELZEXTRUDIERTEN POLYVINYLALKOHOLS | [2019/37] | English: | INSTANT RELEASE CAPSULE BASED ON HOT MELT EXTRUDED POLYVINYL ALCOHOL | [2019/37] | French: | CAPSULE À LIBÉRATION INSTANTANÉE À BASE D'ALCOOL POLYVINYLIQUE EXTRUDÉ À CHAUD | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 26.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2016116121 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2016079142 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD:THE) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * claims 1-7 * [I] 7-10; | [X]EP2446739 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO2016013675 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * claims 1-11 *; | [XI] - DE JAEGHERE W ET AL, "Hot-melt extrusion of polyvinyl alcohol for oral immediate release applications", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150706), vol. 492, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2015.07.009, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 1 - 9, XP029258604 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2015.07.009 | [X] - COLIN P DERDEYN ET AL, "Polyvinyl Alcohol Particle Size and Suspension Characteristics", AJNR AM J NEURORADIOL, (19950630), vol. 16, pages 1335 - 1343, XP055397013 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * figures 3-4; table 1 * | [A] - BOWEN P, "Particle Size Distribution Measurement from Millimeters to Nanometers and from Rods to Platelets", JOURNAL OF DISPERSION SCIENCE AND TECHNOL, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020101), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1081/DIS-120015368, ISSN 0193-2691, pages 631 - 662, XP009102859 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * figures 9, 24, 27; tables 4, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/DIS-120015368 | by applicant | US5456923 | EP2105130 | DE3811201 | - CHIOUW. L.; RIEGELMAN S., "Pharmaceutical applications of Solid dispersion systems", J. Pharm Sci., (19710000), vol. 60, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600600902, pages 1281 - 1301, XP009027674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600600902 | - SINSWAT P. et al., "Stabilizer choice for rapid dissolving high potency itraconazole particles formed by evaporative precipitation into aqueous solution", Int. J. of Pharmaceutics, (20050000), vol. 302, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2005.06.027, pages 113 - 124, XP005017012 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2005.06.027 | - DINUNZIO J. C. et al., "III Amorphous compositions using concentration enhancing polymers for improved bioavailability of itraconazole", Molecular Pharmaceutics, (20080000), vol. 5, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1021/mp800042d, pages 968 - 980, XP008178189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp800042d | - BREITENBACH J., "Melt extrusion: from process to drug delivery technology", Eur. J. Pharm. Biopharm., (20020000), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1016/S0939-6411(02)00061-9, pages 107 - 117, XP004377352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(02)00061-9 |