EP3535933 - CONNECTING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE TO A REMOTE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARSCHHAMMER, Florian Pallinger Strasse 17 84529 Tittmoning / DE | 02 /
WERNER, Hans Peter Bernauer Str. 17 89537 Giengen / DE | 03 /
GRIMMINGER, Jochen Oberer Quellweg36 89407 Dillingen / DE | 04 /
RODNEY, Christopher Angerstraße 4 89355 Gundremmingen / DE | [2019/38] |
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
GARSCHHAMMER, Florian Frauenstr. 83 89073 Ulm / DE | ||
02 /
WERNER, Hans Peter Bernauer Str. 17 89537 Giengen / DE | |||
03 /
GRIMMINGER, Jochen Oberer Quellweg36 89407 Dillingen / DE | |||
04 /
RODNEY, Christopher Angerstraße 4 89355 Gundremmingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17791649.1 | 20.10.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017EP76815 | Priority number, date | DE201610221614 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: DE102016221614 | [2019/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082936 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535933 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, G08C17/02, H04M1/725, H04W12/06, H04W84/12 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H04L12/2809 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/72415 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
G08C2201/93 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | VERBINDEN EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS MIT EINER FERNBEDIENUNG | [2019/37] | English: | CONNECTING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE TO A REMOTE CONTROL | [2019/37] | French: | RELIER UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER À UNE TÉLÉCOMMANDE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 04.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102013200374 (BSH BOSCH & SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] * [I] 1-18; | [XI]EP2950289 (BEDOIAN HEIKE [DE]) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * sentence 1, paragraph 67 * [I] 1-18; | [IP]EP3139546 (ARCELIK AS [TR]) [IP] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * | by applicant | WO2015039874 | EP2913906 | WO2016085582 |