EP3522931 - HIGHLY POTENT MULTIMERIC E-SELECTIN ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlycoMimetics, Inc. 9708 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNANI, John L. 12819 Doe Lane Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 02 /
PETERSON, John M. 220 Post Road Slate Hill, New York 10973 / US | 03 /
BAEK, Myung-Gi 18404 Tapwood Road Boyds, Maryland 20841 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Ford, Hazel, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Ford, Hazel, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17791785.3 | 06.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017US55648 | Priority number, date | US201662405792P | 07.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662405792 P | US201762451415P | 27.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762451415 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018068010 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522931 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/60, C07H15/207, C07H15/26, A61P35/00 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
C07H7/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/7034 (CN,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/7052 (CN);
A61K47/549 (CN);
A61P1/00 (CN);
A61P1/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (CN);
A61P29/00 (CN,KR);
A61P3/10 (CN);
A61P35/00 (CN,KR);
A61P35/02 (CN);
A61P35/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07H15/207 (EP,US);
C07H15/26 (EP,US);
C07H7/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | HOCHWIRKSAME MULTIMERE E-SELECTIN-ANTAGONISTEN | [2019/33] | English: | HIGHLY POTENT MULTIMERIC E-SELECTIN ANTAGONISTS | [2019/33] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DE E-SÉLECTINE MULTIMÉRIQUES TRÈS PUISSANTS | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 08.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2008060378 (GLYCOMIMETICS INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2014070991 (GLYCOMIMETICS INC [US]); | by applicant | WO2013090926 | WO2013096926 | USRE44778E |