EP3534829 - CLEANING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TWEEDIE, Robert c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 02 /
STICKNEY, Timothy c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 03 /
VINCENT, Christopher c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 04 /
MOLE, Alan c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 05 /
COURTNEY, Stephen c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Booth, Andrew Steven, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17792133.5 | 24.10.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017GB53195 | Priority number, date | GB20160018630 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: GB 201618630 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018083443 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534829 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/02, A61C17/22 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A61C17/0202 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61C17/02 (CN);
A61C17/227 (EP,GB,US);
A61C17/36 (CN,GB,US);
A46B13/04 (US);
A46B15/0004 (US);
A61C17/0205 (CN);
A61C17/028 (GB,US);
A61C17/032 (CN);
A61C17/221 (EP,GB,US);
A61C17/225 (CN,GB);
A61C17/28 (CN,GB,US);
A61C17/3436 (US);
A61C17/3445 (US);
A61C17/3454 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/37] | English: | CLEANING APPLIANCE | [2019/37] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 11.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/36] | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007025244 (HOULE PHILIP R [US]) [A] 1-37* figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2014140964 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 4-6 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 20 *; | [XY]WO2015087176 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,10-37 * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 21; figure -; table 1 * * page 29, line 16 - page 32, line 8 * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]WO2015087219 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,10-37 * page 7, line 18 - page 15, line 21; figure -; claim - * [Y] 4-6 |