EP3452047 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ESTRIOL AND AMITRIPTYLINE OR NORTRIPTYLINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC VULVAL AND PERINEAL PAIN AND SYMPTOMS AND CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/11] | COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC VULVAL AND PERINEAL PAIN AND SYMPTOMS AND CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED THEREWITH | ||
[2020/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TA Pharma Pty Ltd 60 Sugarloaf Crescent Castlecrag NSW 2068 / AU | [2019/28] |
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states T&A Pharma Pty. Limited 60 Sugarloaf Crescent Castlecrag NSW 2068 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANCAILLIE, Thierry 60 Sugarloaf Crescent Castlecrag, New South Wales 2068 / AU | 02 /
HEWITT, Alan Brooklyn House Ruabon Road Pen-y-cae Wrexham LL14 1TW / GB | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17792282.0 | 01.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017AU50398 | Priority number, date | AU20160901605 | 02.05.2016 Original published format: AU 2016901605 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017190183 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452047 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452047 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/565, A61K31/135, A61P15/00, A61K9/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/566 (EP,US);
A61K31/567 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/566, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2020/02] | A61K31/565, A61K31/566, A61K31/567, A61K31/135, A61K31/55, A61P15/00, A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/11] | A61K31/565, A61K31/566, A61K31/567, A61K31/135, A61K31/55, A61P15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ESTRIOL UND AMITRIPTYLIN ODER NORTRIPTYLIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CHRONISCHEM VULVA- UND DAMMSCHMERZ UND SYMPTOMEN UND DAMIT ASSOZIIERTEN LEIDEN | [2020/48] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ESTRIOL AND AMITRIPTYLINE OR NORTRIPTYLINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC VULVAL AND PERINEAL PAIN AND SYMPTOMS AND CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED THEREWITH | [2020/48] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DE L`ESTRIOL ET DE L`AMITRIPTYLINE OU DE LA NORTRIPTYLINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR VULVAIRE ET PÉRINÉALE CHRONIQUE ET DES SYMPTOMES ET AFFECTIONS ASSOCIÉS À CELLE-CI | [2020/48] |
Former [2019/11] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CHRONISCHEM VULVA- UND DAMMSCHMERZ UND SYMPTOMEN UND DAMIT ASSOZIIERTEN LEIDEN | ||
Former [2019/11] | COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC VULVAL AND PERINEAL PAIN AND SYMPTOMS AND CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED THEREWITH | ||
Former [2019/11] | COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR VULVAIRE ET PÉRINÉALE CHRONIQUE ET DES SYMPTOMES ET AFFECTIONS ASSOCIÉS À CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.05.2017 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | TR | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.05.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.05.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007021805 (DRUGTECH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* example -; claims 1-6,15,17 *; | [Y] - PAGANO R ET AL, "Use of amitriptyline cream in the management of entry dyspareunia due to provoked vestibulodynia", JOURNAL OF LOWER GENITAL TRACT DISEASE 2012 LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS USA, (201210), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 1089-2591, pages 394 - 397, XP009517327 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/LGT.0b013e3182449bd6 | [Y] - SHAH NIMA ET AL, "Update in Diagnosis and Treatment of Chronic Pelvic Pain Syndromes", CURRENT BLADDER DYSFUNCTION REPORTS, SPRINGER US, BOSTON, vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S11884-015-0302-Y, ISSN 1931-7212, (20150719), pages 198 - 206, (20150719), XP035532959 [Y] 1-15 * page 204, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11884-015-0302-y | [Y] - HOPE K. HAEFNER ET AL, "The Vulvodynia Guideline :", JOURNAL OF LOWER GENITAL TRACT DISEASE, US, (20050101), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1097/00128360-200501000-00009, ISSN 1089-2591, pages 40 - 51, XP055645355 [Y] 1-15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00128360-200501000-00009 | [Y] - Lori Boardman, "Topical Therapy for Vulvodynia", NVA News, (20050101), URL: https://www.nva.org/getfile/issue-33-winter-2005, (20191121), XP055645309 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, column l * * page 4, column l * | [Y] - BAZIN SYLVIE ET AL, "[Evaluation of an estrogen vaginal cream for the treatment of dyspareunia: a double-blind randomized trial].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (201108), Database accession no. NLM21846439, XP002796263 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2007292461 (TAMARKIN DOV [IL], et al) [X] 1-24 * abstract, pg 1 para 3, pg 6 para 123, pg 8 para 150, pg 10 para 178, pg 34 para 299, pg 50 para 495 *; | [X]WO2010118461 (VANCAILLIE THIERRY [AU], et al) [X] 1-10 and 12-15 * abstract, pg 1 In 25 - pg 2 In 10, pg 2 In 24-26, pg 3 In 34, pg 7 In 19-31, pg 8 In 9-11, pg 10 In 4 - pg 11 In 20, claims *; | [A]US2016051683 (BANOV DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract, pg 1 para 9, pg 6 para 78, *; | [A] - "Vulvodynia", Methodist Physicians Clinic. Services, Omaha, US, (20170627), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160326133331/http://www.methodistsexualwellness.com/services/vulvodynia/, (20160326), XP009516525 [A] 1-24 * as per Wayback Machine whole document * | [A] - COX, K. J. et al., "Assessment and management options for women with vulvodynia", Journal of Midwifery & Women's Health, (20120000), vol. 57, no. 3, pages 231 - 240, XP055436312 [A] 1-24 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1542-2011.2012.00162.x | by applicant | - PAGANO et al., J Low Genit Tract Dis, (20120000), vol. 16, pages 394 - 397 | - Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy |