EP3453390 - POLYMERIZED DRUG-CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, FI, GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biodynamic Research Foundation 3F, Kenshin Bldg. 24-6, Kuwamizu 1-chome Chuo-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 862-0954 / JP | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/11] | For all designated states Biodynamic Research Foundation 21-24 Kotoh 3-chome Higashi-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 862-0909 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Hiroshi 21-24 Kotoh 3-chome Higashi-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 862-0909 / JP | 02 /
FANG, Jun 2004-1 Shimosuzurikawa-machi Kita-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 861-5522 / JP | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2019/11] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17792775.3 | 02.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017JP17288 | Priority number, date | JP20160093407 | 06.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016093407 | [2019/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017191843 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453390 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453390 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/351, A61K9/08, A61K9/14, A61K31/555, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/18, A61K47/24, A61K47/26, A61K47/36, A61K47/42, A61K47/50, A61P35/00, A61K9/00 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (US);
A61K31/351 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/18 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (EP,US);
A61K47/58 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | A61K31/351, A61K9/08, A61K9/14, A61K31/555, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/18, A61K47/24, A61K47/26, A61K47/36, A61K47/42, A61K47/50, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT POLYMERISIERTEM WIRKSTOFF | [2019/11] | English: | POLYMERIZED DRUG-CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2019/11] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT UN MÉDICAMENT POLYMÉRISÉ | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2018 | Translation filed | 27.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 29.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011072627 (USTAV MAKROMOLEKULARNI CHEMIE [CZ], et al); | International search | [XY]JPS6485922 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]JPH01156925 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD); | [XY]JP2002514210 ; | [XY]JP2010024170 (MAEDA HIROSHI); | [XY]JP2011516587 ; | [XY]WO2013035750 (MAEDA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2015076312 (MAEDA HIROSHI [JP]); | [XY]JP2015535238 ; | [PX]WO2016103867 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | [PX]WO2017038607 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); |