EP3526184 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUOROETHANE AND 1,1-DICHLOROETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRAIT, Dominique 874 Route du Bas Privas 69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
SCHERPEREEL, Camille 519 rue Joseph Bedor 38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Leca, François Michel ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17793704.2 | 09.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017FR52751 | Priority number, date | FR20160059845 | 12.10.2016 Original published format: FR 1659845 | [2019/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069609 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526184 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C17/383, C07C19/12, C07C21/08 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
C07C17/383 (EP,US);
C07C19/12 (US);
C07C21/08 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/12 (EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/08 (EP);
C07C17/383, C07C19/12 (EP);
C07C17/383, C07C21/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT 1-CHLOR-2,2-DIFLUORETHAN UND 1,1-DICHLORETHYLEN | [2019/34] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUOROETHANE AND 1,1-DICHLOROETHYLENE | [2019/34] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DU 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUOROETHANE ET DU 1,1-DICHLOROETHYLENE. | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 04.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015082812 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015082812 |