EP3612949 - RECONCILING CONFLICTS BETWEEN REPLICAS OF TREE-STRUCTURED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEVERIDGE, James E. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Cupitt, Philip Leslie Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17793806.5 | 20.10.2017 | [2020/09] | WO2017US57524 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019078876 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612949 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G06F16/273 (EP);
G06F16/2365 (US);
G06F16/27 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | ABGLEICHEN VON KONFLIKTEN ZWISCHEN NACHBILDUNGEN VON DATEN MIT BAUMSTRUKTUR | [2020/10] | English: | RECONCILING CONFLICTS BETWEEN REPLICAS OF TREE-STRUCTURED DATA | [2020/09] | French: | RÉSOLUTION DE CONFLITS ENTRE RÉPLIQUES DE DONNÉES À STRUCTURE ARBORESCENTE | [2020/09] |
Former [2020/09] | BEILEIGUNG VON KONFLIKTEN ZWISCHEN REPLIKEN VON BAUMSTRUKTURIERTEN DATEN | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 28.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006242444 (NOVIK LEV [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008010587 (WAKE NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010106687 (MARCY M SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [I]US2011066626 (DHARMALINGAM KRISHNAMOORTHY [IN]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0025] - [0123]; figures 3A-3C,4B-4I *; | [I]US2014259005 (JEFFREY MARK CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0128] * |