EP3529343 - AMBIENT MOISTURE-ACTIVATED SURFACE TREATMENT POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterilex LLC 111 Lake Front Drive Hunt Valley, MD 21030 / US | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOZNIAK, Mark 111 Lake Front Drive Hunt Valley MD 21030 / US | 02 /
FU, Edward 111 Lake Front Drive Hunt Valley MD 21030 / US | 03 /
BERGSTROM, Chris 111 Lake Front Drive Hunt Valley MD 21030 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17794149.9 | 18.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017US57122 | Priority number, date | US201662409497P | 18.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662409497 P | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018075604 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3529343 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/60, C11D1/62, C11D3/00, C11D3/10, C11D3/20, C11D3/33, C11D3/36, C11D3/37, C11D3/39, C11D7/12, C11D7/14, C11D17/06, C11D1/722 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
C11D3/3902 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,CN,US);
C11D1/60 (EP,US);
C11D1/722 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/0047 (EP,US);
C11D3/10 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/2003 (US);
C11D3/2065 (EP,US);
C11D3/22 (CN);
C11D3/30 (US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
C11D3/361 (EP,US);
C11D3/3707 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/382 (CN);
C11D3/3942 (CN,US);
C11D3/40 (US);
C11D7/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | UMGEBUNGSFEUCHTIGKEITSAKTIVIERTES OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSPULVER | [2019/35] | English: | AMBIENT MOISTURE-ACTIVATED SURFACE TREATMENT POWDER | [2019/35] | French: | POUDRE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ACTIVÉE PAR L'HUMIDITÉ AMBIANTE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 16.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US4941989 (KRAMER DAVID N [US], et al); | [XI]WO0057703 (ECOLAB INC [US]); | [Y]US2013052342 (STEVENSON RANDAL D [US], et al) | by applicant | US4941989 | US4941999 | US5320805 | US2016066580 |