EP3532465 - PYRAZOLE AMIDE COMPOUNDS AS IRAK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSO, Kin 5000 Diamond Heights Boulevard San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yan 178 Albacore Ln. Foster City, CA 944404 / US | 03 /
YEN, Rose 1156 Shotwell Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 04 /
TAYLOR, Vanessa 564 29th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | 05 /
HECKRODT, Thilo 1918 11th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 06 /
SINGH, Rajinder 1832 Hillman Avenue Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 07 /
SHAW, Simon 1232 19th Street Unit 10 Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 08 /
LI, Hui 1232 19th Street Unit 10 Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/09] |
Former [2019/36] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17794624.1 | 25.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58329 | Priority number, date | US201662413299P | 26.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662413299 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018081294 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532465 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3532465 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D471/04, A61K31/44, A61K31/4439, A61K31/497, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, A61P7/00, A61P1/00, A61P3/00, A61P11/00, A61P43/00, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D403/14, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/497 (CN);
A61K31/4439 (CN);
A61K31/444 (CN);
A61K31/4545 (CN);
A61K31/496 (CN);
A61K31/5377 (CN);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,CN);
A61P13/12 (CN);
A61P15/00 (CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/12 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP,CN);
A61P37/08 (CN);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (CN);
A61P7/06 (CN);
A61P9/00 (EP,CN);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D471/04, A61K31/44, A61K31/4439, A61K31/497, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, A61P7/00, A61P1/00, A61P3/00, A61P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRAZOLAMIDVERBINDUNGEN ALS IRAK-INHIBITOREN | [2019/36] | English: | PYRAZOLE AMIDE COMPOUNDS AS IRAK INHIBITORS | [2019/36] | French: | COMPOSÉS PYRAZOLE AMIDE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS D'IRAK | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 26.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2021/30] | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23158563.9 / EP4212523 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | LU | 25.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.03.2023 | |
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015068856 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-58 * claims 1-17 * * page 1, paragraph 1 *; | [X]WO2015069594 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-13,20-27,46,48-51,53 * page 207; example 205 * * claims 1-8 *; | [IP]WO2016172560 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [IP] 1-58 * claims 1-75 * * page 1, lines 9-11 ** examples * | Examination | US2011251176 | WO2015068856 | by applicant | US4738851 | US4882150 | US4921475 | US5008110 | US5077033 | US5087240 | US5088977 | US5164189 | US5163899 | US5254346 | US5290561 | US5332213 | US5336168 | US5352456 | US5403841 | US5407713 | US5521222 | US5698219 | US5776445 | US5800807 | US6056950 | US6197934 | US6261547 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, A.C.S. Symposium Series, and in Bioreversible Carriers in Drug Design, American Pharmaceutical Association and Pergamon Press, (19870000), vol. 14 | - "General Principles", FINGL; WOODBURY, Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, Pergamon Press, vol. 1, pages 1 - 46 | - TUMAS et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 107, no. 6, pages 1025 - 1033 | - SZELENYI et al., Arzneimittelforschung, (20000000), vol. 50, no. 11, pages 1037 - 42 | - KAWAGUCHI et al., Clin. Exp. Allergy, (19940000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 238 - 244 | - SUGIMOTO et al., Immunopharmacology, (20000000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 1 - 7 |