EP3525568 - ROOT CROP HARVESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grimme Landmaschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Hunteburger Str. 32 49401 Damme / DE | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEHUES, Christoph Kroger Pickerweg 104 49393 Lohne / DE | 02 /
PÖLKING, Alfons Fichtenweg 8 49439 Steinfeld / DE | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Wischmeyer, André, et al Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17794673.8 | 13.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017EP76259 | Priority number, date | DE20161012245 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016012245 | [2019/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069537 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525568 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3525568 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01D17/10, A01D33/08 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A01D33/08 (EP,CN,EA,US);
A01D17/10 (CN,EA);
A01D17/101 (EP,US);
A01D33/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HACKFRUCHTERNTER | [2019/34] | English: | ROOT CROP HARVESTER | [2019/34] | French: | MACHINE DE RÉCOLTE DE TUBERCULES | [2020/41] |
Former [2019/34] | MACHINE DE RÉCOLTE DE PLANTES SARCLÉES | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 09.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19195438.7 / EP3616491 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | MT | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | LU | 13.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19524145 (DAVOUDI HELGA [DE]) [AD] 1-12,16-25* the whole document *; | [AD]DE102007034446 (GRIMME LANDMASCHF FRANZ [DE]) [AD] 1-12,16-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE9320575U | DE19524145 | DE102007034446 | DE202013102558U |