EP3454806 - WOUND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eksteen, Ehren Cronje Buttonquail Place 1509 Zambezi Country Estate Montana 0182 Pretoria / ZA | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17795731.3 | 15.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017IB52847 | Priority number, date | ZA20160003245 | 13.05.2016 Original published format: ZA 201603245 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017195181 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454806 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3454806 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61M27/00, A61F13/00 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
A61M1/86 (EP,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61F13/0206 (US);
A61M1/85 (EP,US);
A61M1/912 (EP,US);
A61M1/92 (EP,US);
A61M1/94 (EP,US);
A61M39/10 (US);
A61F2013/00412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | A61F13/02, A61M27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WUNDTHERAPIE | [2019/12] | English: | WOUND THERAPY | [2019/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE PLAIES | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 01.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2009066104 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,6,10-12,14 * page 12, line 29 - page 14, line 22; figure 1 * * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 14 *[Y] 2,4,5,7-9; | [XY]WO2009124100 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10,11,13,14 * page 43, line 10 - page 45, line 3; figures 15,16; example 1 * [Y] 2,4-9,12; | [XYI]US2014221907 (SCHOLZ MATTHEW T [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0028] , [0043] , [0037] , [0038]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2,4-9,12 [I] 10 | International search | [A]US2007055209 (PATEL HARISH A [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * Figures 1, 3: [0028] - [0031], claims 1-8. *; | [A]WO2009066104 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [A] 1-39 * Page 12, line 29 - page 14, line 13; claims 1-4, 11,12,14, 16,19-22; figure 1. *; | [A]EP1478313 (KCI MEDICAL RESOURCES [KY]) [A] 1-39* [0030] - [0034], [0043], [0066] - [0068], claims 9, 13, 17; figures1, 3, 5,20, 23. * |