EP3457189 - LENS DRIVING DEVICE, CAMERA MODULE, AND PORTABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Tae Jin 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Seung Taek 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Kap Jin 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 04 /
HAN, Jin Suk 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 05 /
MIN, Sang Jun 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 17796345.1 | 08.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017KR04767 | Priority number, date | KR20160056777 | 10.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160056777 | KR20160066280 | 30.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160066280 | KR20160066608 | 30.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160066608 | KR20160085367 | 06.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160085367 | [2019/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017196045 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457189 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/105, G03B3/10, H02K1/17, G02B7/00, G01B11/30, G02B7/02, G02B7/09, G02B26/08, G02B27/64 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
G02B7/09 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/001 (CN,US);
G02B7/105 (EP,CN,US);
G01B11/30 (EP,US);
G02B26/085 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/646 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/00 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/005 (CN);
G02B7/02 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/021 (CN);
G02B7/022 (CN);
G02B7/023 (CN);
G02B7/026 (CN);
G03B13/34 (CN);
G03B13/36 (CN,US);
G03B17/12 (CN);
G03B3/10 (EP,US);
G03B30/00 (CN);
G03B5/04 (CN);
H02K1/17 (EP,CN,US);
H02K11/215 (CN);
H02K41/0356 (CN);
H04N23/50 (CN,US);
H04N23/54 (CN);
H04N23/55 (CN);
H04N23/57 (CN,US);
G03B2205/0023 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | G02B7/105, G03B3/10, H02K1/17, G02B7/00, G01B11/30, G02B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | LINSENANSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KAMERAMODUL UND TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/12] | English: | LENS DRIVING DEVICE, CAMERA MODULE, AND PORTABLE DEVICE | [2019/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE LENTILLE, MODULE D'APPAREIL DE PRISE DE VUES, ET DISPOSITIF PORTABLE | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2018 | Translation filed | 03.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016003103 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2013210550 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD ); | [A]US2014327965 (CHEN SHU SHAN [TW], et al); | [A]JP2015191213 (NIDEC COPAL CORP); | [A]KR20160008860 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2016051078 (NIDEC COPAL CORP) |